Sweet v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Karla A. Sweet
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00604
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Judge Beaton held a combined hearing via Zoom on January 9, 2024 in case nos. 3:23-cv-571, 3:23-cv-572, 3:23-cv-573, 3:23-cv-581, 3:23-cv-583, 3:23-cv-595, 3:23-cv-597, 3:23-cv-604, and 3:23-cv-610. Plaintiffs counsel in cases -571 and -573 did not appear. Case nos. -571, -573, -581, -583, -604, and -610 remain stayed while the parties finalize a Master Settlement Agreement, and the Court orders counsel in those cases to file status reports no later than April 19, 2024. Case nos. -572, -595, and -597 are not stayed, but the Court likewise orders counsel in those cases to file status reports regarding the next steps in the litigation no later than April 19, 2024. (Court Reporter: Terri Horton)(TIC: 0/25 minutes) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 1/9/2024 granting #20 Motion for Attorney Matthew E. DePaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 9, 2024 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER (EBOC): The Court entered a deficiency notice on 11/20/2023 and ordered Sejal Brahmbhatt, Brian A. Abramson, Margot G. Trivino and John T. Boundas to respond by 12/4/2023. Because these attorneys have failed to timely cure the deficiency, the Court orders them to cure the deficiency or otherwise show cause why they should not be terminated as counsel within 14 days of this order. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
January 8, 2024 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Status of Settlement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Startsman, Emily)
December 5, 2023 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
December 4, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Matthew E. DePaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3932828. by Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (DePaz, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (JM).
November 29, 2023 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Sanofi has filed a Notice of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings (DN #18 ), informing the Court that the parties are finalizing a Master Settlement Agreement and asking the Court to stay this matter through May 24, 2024. The Court grants the request for a stay in partvacating all deadlines EXCEPT the status conference scheduled for January 9, 2024, which will proceed as planned. The Court further orders the parties to file a joint status report by January 8, 2024 updating the Court on the anticipated resolution and any next steps the parties anticipate in the litigation. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Startsman, Emily)
November 28, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Startsman, Emily)
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Startsman on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Startsman, Emily)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: In light of this case's transfer from the Eastern District of Louisiana, the Court orders the parties to file a joint status report within 21 days describing the cases procedural posture, any outstanding deadlines, the principal disputed issues, and any past or anticipated efforts to resolve this matter outside of court. The report should also address when this case could be ready to try and the steps preliminary to trial. The Court further schedules a remote status conference to discuss the joint status report on 1/9/24 at 2:00 p.m. ET. The parties may join the Zoom hearing by audio only (cameras turned off) at https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603277726?pwd=Z3R3S05sbSsxdkFITDgxT0tldEc2dz09. The meeting ID is 160 327 7726 and the passcode is 612433. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Sejal Brahmbhatt re #8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/4/2023. (KJA)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Margot G. Trevino re #8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/4/2023. (KJA)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Brian A. Abramson re #8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/4/2023. (KJA)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John T. Boundas re #8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/4/2023. (KJA)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Matthew Edward DePaz re #8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/4/2023. (KJA)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to District Judge Benjamin Beaton. (KJA)
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-10432. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Western District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from laed on 11/20/2023.]
September 29, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Britton, Mary) [Transferred from laed on 11/20/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/20/2023.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/20/2023.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (cc) [Transferred from laed on 11/20/2023.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg) [Transferred from laed on 11/20/2023.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6403402) filed by Karla A. Sweet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Attorney John T. Boundas added to party Karla A. Sweet(pty:pla).(Boundas, John) [Transferred from laed on 11/20/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweet v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla A. Sweet
Represented By: Brian A. Abramson
Represented By: Margot G. Trevino
Represented By: John T. Boundas
Represented By: Sejal Brahmbhatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?