Curtis v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marshall Wayne Curtis
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, NCB Management Services, Inc., Park Community Federal Credit Union and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00613
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Address by William M. Huse (Huse, William)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/16/2024: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/29/2024 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (DLW)
January 11, 2024 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 01/04/2024 re #20 Notice of Settlement filed by Marshall Wayne Curtis. Curtis's claims against Park Community are DISMISSED without prejudice. This order does not affect Curtis's claims against any other defendant. cc: Counsel (HMC)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/2/2024 granting #18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Equifax's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 1/12/2024. cc: Counsel (DLW)
January 3, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Settlement as to Park Community FCU only by Marshall Wayne Curtis (Lawson, James)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/2/2024 granting #17 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Park Community's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 1/12/2024. cc: Counsel (DLW)
December 29, 2023 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, John)
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Park Community Federal Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mattingly, Sarah)
December 5, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Park Community Federal Credit Union. (Mattingly, Sarah)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/1/2023 granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Equifax and Park Community shall file responses to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 12/29/2023. cc: Counsel (DLW)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 11/30/2023 granting #5 Motion for William M. Huse to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
November 30, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Park Community Federal Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mattingly, Sarah)
November 30, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah S. Mattingly on behalf of Park Community Federal Credit Union (Mattingly, Sarah)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent NCB Management Services, Inc. for NCB Management Services, Inc. by NCB Management Services, Inc. (Lewis, Danielle)
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by NCB Management Services, Inc. (Lewis, Danielle)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Gregory, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Williams, John)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/27/2023; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for William M. Huse to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3928166. by Defendant Trans Union, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission of William M. Huse, Esq. Pro Hac Vice) (Huse, William)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Hardin District Clerk and Counsel of Record/parties re #1 Notice of Removal. (DeW)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC by Trans Union, LLC. (DeW)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DeW)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hardin District Court, case number 23-C-02260, filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3927253.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons to Trans Union LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint to Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit C - Consent of Equifax, #4 Exhibit D - Consent of NCB, #5 Exhibit E - Consent of Park Community, #6 Cover Sheet) (DeW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Wayne Curtis
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCB Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Community Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Sarah S. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Gregory E. Mayes
Represented By: Michael E. Gregory
Represented By: William M. Huse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?