Tellman v. Acima Digital, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Ashley M. Tellman
Defendant: Acima Digital, LLC., Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, LLC, Heights Finance Corp., Mariner Finance, LLC., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC., Trans Union, LLC. and Transworld Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00620
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/16/2024: Tellman's claims against Trans Union are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Trans Union, LLC as a defendant in the record of this matter. cc: Counsel (DLW)
January 15, 2024 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Trans Union, LLC only by Ashley M. Tellman. (Lawson, James)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/5/2024. Tellmans claims against Comenity Bank and Acima Digital, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice. The parties shall file an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within sixty (60) days of entry of this Order. cc: counsel (DeW)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 01/04/2024 re #28 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. Tellman's claims against Portfolio Recovery Associates are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC as a defendant in the record of this matter. This Order does not affect Tellman's claims against any other defendant. (Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. terminated.) cc: Counsel (HMC)
January 4, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Settlement as to Comenity Bank and Acima Digital, LLC by Acima Digital, LLC., Comenity Bank (Manley, Reid)
January 3, 2024 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
December 27, 2023 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Drop Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC as a Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tucker, Joseph)
December 27, 2023 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Aston Acquisition Corp. for Transworld Systems, Inc. by Transworld Systems, Inc. (Lewis, Danielle)
December 18, 2023 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Mariner Finance, LLC. (Smith, William)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/6/2023: Tellman's claims against Trans Union are DISMISSED without prejudice. Tellman and Trans Union shall file an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within forty-five (45) days of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel (DLW)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING ACIMA DIGITAL, LLC'S AND COMENITY BANK'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/5/2023 granting #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Acima and Comenity shall have up to and including 1/3/2024 to file their responses to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (DLW)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/5/2023 granting Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Equifax's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 1/3/2024. cc: Counsel (DLW)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AGREED ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/5/2023 granting #10 Proposed Agreed Order. Mariner Finance, LLC may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 12/18/2023. cc: Counsel (DLW)
December 6, 2023 Filing 21 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/5/2023 granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. PRA is granted an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to and including 1/5/2024. cc: Counsel (DLW)
December 5, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Heights Finance Holding Co., Corporate Parent SouthernCo, Inc., Corporate Parent CURO Intermediate Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent CURO Financial Technologies Corp., Corporate Parent CURO Group Holdings Corp. for Heights Finance Corp. by Heights Finance Corp. (Manley, Reid)
December 5, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Bread Financial Payments, Inc., Corporate Parent Bread Financial Holdings Inc. for Comenity Bank. by Comenity Bank. (Manley, Reid)
December 5, 2023 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Rent-A-Center East, Inc., Corporate Parent Acima Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Upbound Group, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors for Acima Digital, LLC by Acima Digital, LLC. (Manley, Reid)
December 5, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union, LLC by Ashley M. Tellman (Lawson, James)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Acima Digital, LLC, Comenity Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Manley, Reid)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/04/2023; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 11/30/2023: Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay hereby RECUSES himself pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455. cc: Counsel, DJH-CM (DLW)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, John)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/30/2023: Tellman's claims against Heights Finance Corp. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Tellman and Heights Finance Corp. shall file an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within forty-five (45) days of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel (DLW)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Mariner Finance, LLC. (Smith, William)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent MF Raven Holdings, Inc. for Mariner Finance, LLC. by Mariner Finance, LLC. (Smith, William)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/29/2023; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tucker, Joseph)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement as to Heights Finance by Ashley M. Tellman (Lawson, James)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: Incorrect Plaintiff Name placed on Original Notice to State Court. document attached to docket entry re: #4 Notice (Other) ; Correct document attached to this entry. (DJT)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Hardin Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/27/2023) (DJT).
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent PRA Group, Inc. for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.. (DJT)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. from Hardin Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-01575. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AKYWDC-3928309, filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File, #3 Exhibit B - Consents) (DJT)
November 27, 2023 ANSWER filed in Hardin Circuit Court (See DN #1 -2 for full viewing) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.. (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tellman v. Acima Digital, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley M. Tellman
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acima Digital, LLC.
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heights Finance Corp.
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariner Finance, LLC.
Represented By: William E. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.
Represented By: Joseph N. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?