Premier Packaging, LLC v. Audion Automation, LTD.
Plaintiff: Premier Packaging, LLC
Defendant: Audion Automation, LTD. doing business as Clamco doing business as PAC Machinery
Case Number: 3:2024cv00245
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 5/24/2024 granting #10 Motion for Nicholas T. Stack to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion for Scot A. Hinshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Audion Automation, LTD.. (Stack, Nicholas)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Audion Automation, LTD.. (Stack, Nicholas)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Scot A. Hinshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4031619. by Defendant Audion Automation, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stack, Nicholas)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Nicholas T. Stack to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4031613. by Defendant Audion Automation, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stack, Nicholas)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Premier Packaging, LLC. Audion Automation, LTD. waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Stosberg, Andrew)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Premier Packaging, LLC. (McGraw, Brian)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Premier Packaging, LLC. (McGraw, Brian)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 5/2/2024: Within ten (10) days of the date of entry of this Order, Plaintiff Premier Packaging shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and shall SHOW CAUSE why it has not timely complied with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). cc: Counsel (DLW)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Missing Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/24/2024. (KDY)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Audion Automation, LTD.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (KDY)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Premier Packaging, LLC. (KDY)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (KDY)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Premier Packaging, LLC against Audion Automation, LTD. Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4015703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - PAC Order Confirmation, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Tendered) (KDY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier Packaging, LLC v. Audion Automation, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. McGraw
Represented By: Andrew D Stosberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audion Automation, LTD. doing business as Clamco doing business as PAC Machinery
Represented By: Nicholas T. Stack
Represented By: Scot A. Hinshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?