Roberts v. Wethington et al
Plaintiff: Roberts and Carol Roberts
Defendant: Wethington, James Wethington, Robert S. Mink, Debra H. Dawahare, Michael I. Less, Kacey L. Faughnan, K. Gregory Haynes, Courtney Ross Samford, Grover C. Potts, Jr., J. Brooken Smith, Elizabeth E. Perkins, John P. Brice, John Knox Walkup, Franklin K. Jelsma, M.E. Buck Dougherty, III, Henry E. Kinser, Clifton M. Lipman, Matthew Tierney, Scott Wedding, Mary Lauren Teague, Harris A. Gilbert, Sherri P. McIntyre, John S. Osborn, Jr., Daniel Nick Burlew, II, Lisa Dempsey, Glen M. Krebs, April Meisenheider, Stewart E. Conner, Robert F. Miller, Cornelius E. Coryell, II, Wyatt Tarrant & Combs LLP, Richard M. Hopgood, Andrew J. Pulliam, Kenneth F. Clark, Jr., Kent Taul, C. Tyson Gorman, Douglas L. McSwain, Bruce Kuegel, Jami K. Lazarov, William Warren Gibson, Jo Lee, V. Paige Paulett, Donald J. Kelly, Jennifer J. Daum, William H. Hollander, Edwin S. Pyle, Deborah H. Patterson, Charlotte L. Hendrick, Kathie McDonald-McClure, Allison Grogan Buckley, Leo F. Camp, Andrew B. Campbell, Teri Van Meter, Kathryn K. Van Namen, William S. Demchak, TTIV, Christy, Lisa E. Underwood, Laura Leach, Theodore T. Myre, Jr., George L. Seay, Jr., Carole D. Christian, Lerner Sampson & Rothfuss, Clifford D. Pierce, Jr., Marshall L. Hix, Lesly A.R. Davis, David W. Seewer, PNC Bank, Robert K. Imperial, Kevin J. Hable, Brenda Payne, Frank H. Reeves, Keith Cain, Joseph B. Reafsnyder, James Wesley Fischer, Virginia Hamilton Snell, Thomas J. Luber, Kimberly Emberton, J. Larry Cashen, Jordan E. Reitler, Sherry P. Porter, Robert (Bobby) Powell, J. Matt San Roman, Erin Brisbay McMahon, Robert L. Crawford, Charlotte I. Hendrick, James Robert Norris, Elizabeth J. Tedesco, Lynn N. Minton, John P. Reisz, Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr., Michael B. Vincenti, R. Joseph Stennis, Jr., Deaconess Hospital, Troy Calvert, Connie S. Bueter, Kerri Bruckner, Sara Lisby, Kevin L. Johns, Claude Porter, Hal A. Gerber, Owner of Aquascapes Pools & Spas, Donna H. Fletcher, Walter R. Morris, Jr., Christina Muffett, Lee A. Harkavy, George J. Miller, G. Alexander Hamilton, Sylvia Munday, Matthew P. Gunn, Arthur A. Rouse, Robert S. Ryan, Stephanie Maguire, Elise C. Hofer, Carl Eppler, William I. Gibbons, Jr., Susan Tierney, Stevenson Land & Tierney, Richard C. Raines, Rachel K. Mulloy, Benjamin T. Keller, Leslie M. Newman, William S. Solmson, Sussan P. Harshbarger, James A. Nitsche, Jason E. Dare, Robert A. Heath, Aaron Hicks, Boyd L. Rhodes, Jr., Lori Payne Eisele, Sarah K. Vandegrift, Theresa K. Schrader, Sharon L. Gold, Christopher A. Melton, Daniel C. Soldato, David L. Swilley, Gregory S. Berman, Gordon B. Davidson, Chelsea K. Painter, Byron E. Leet, John E. Tarrant, Herbert D. Sledd, Angela Thompson, Ekundayo Seton, Michelle Tolle High, Wilson W. Wyatt, Richard Northern, S. Kay Nichols, David A. Calhoun, Jason D. Salomon, Amanda Warford Edge, Julie Sneed Herhhy, Laura H. Therlmann, Stephen C. Hallm, Cynthia H. Mohon, W. Craig Robertson, III, Michael D. Hornback, Jennifer Keller, Daniel F. Hitchcock, Mark Eric Blackstock, David Osborne, Barbara Webb Menefee, Mark Starnes, Jean H. Coppenbarger, Sullivan Mountjoy & Stainback, U.S. Bank, Frank F. Chuppe, Jason A. Lopp, Shannon Bennett, Elizabeth H. Friedman, Stacey L. Showalter, Rebecca Feldpausch, Jack G. Jones, Jr., Janet Coleman, Brittany L. Hampton, Parker W. Duncan, Robert J. Brown, Jay Wethington, Vonda K. Motsinger, Joseph Castlen, Francis J. Mellen, Jr., Susanne C. Pugh, Cynthia J. Tobin, Steven L. Lacey, Thomas R. Dyer, H. Alexander Campbell, Connie Richards, Edwin S. Hopson, James L. Pettis, III, Jennifer Morris, Shannon Hocker, R. Benjamin Straus, Lara Ashley Coleman, Leila G. O'Carra, Justin W. Ross, Jonda M. Gaudin, Jack Conway, Robert E. Craddock, Jr., M. Stephen Pitt, Lisa Smith, J. Lawson Hester, Robert J. Penta, Margaret Young Levi, JPMorgan Chase Bank, John Brice, Byron N. Brown, IV, Barry K. Jones, Harry E. Neblett, Jr., Amber Floyd, Caryn F. Price, J. Mark Burton, S. Joseph Sabatini, Bert T. Combs, Lisa C. DeJaco, Mary L. Fullington, Harnid H. Sheikh, Jr., Martin Rockwell, Glen G. Reid, Stephen R. Price, Sr., Walter M. Jones, Sara Veeneman, Jamie Dimon, Karen J. Greenwell, Amy Jensen, B. Anthony Saunders, Odell Horton, James T. Hodge, Bruce K. Dudley, James L. Coorssen, Matthew M. Lubozynski, William S. Parks and H. Carl Horneman
Case Number: 4:2015cv00041
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Owensboro Office
County: Daviess
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs federal claims areDISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs state-law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. This is a final Order. The Court certifies that an appeal IFP would not be taken in good faith. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Counsel of record (SG)
June 10, 2015 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge David J. Hale on screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The Court will, by separate Order, dismiss this action. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; counsel of record (SG)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #14 Emergency Motion to Hold in Abeyance. Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 6/4/2015. cc: Counsel, Plaintiff (pro se)(JBM)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER (EBOC) by Judge David J. Hale granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP. Once initial review is complete, an order will be entered informing the parties of what steps, if any, must be taken. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Counsel of record (SG)
May 14, 2015 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION Emergency Motion to Hold in Abeyance filed by Gregory S. Berman, John P. Brice, John Brice, Byron N. Brown, IV, Robert J. Brown, Allison Grogan Buckley, Connie S. Bueter, J. Mark Burton, David A. Calhoun, Leo F. Camp, Andrew B. Campbell, H. Alexander Campbell, J. Larry Cashen, Carole D. Christian, Frank F. Chuppe, Kenneth F. Clark, Jr, Lara Ashley Coleman, Bert T. Combs, Stewart E. Conner, James L. Coorssen, Jean H. Coppenbarger, Cornelius E. Coryell, II, Robert E. Craddock, Jr, Robert L. Crawford, Jason E. Dare, Jennifer J. Daum, Gordon B. Davidson, Lesly A.R. Davis, Debra H. Dawahare, Lisa C. DeJaco, M.E. Buck Dougherty, III, Bruce K. Dudley, Parker W. Duncan, Thomas R. Dyer, Amanda Warford Edge, Lori Payne Eisele, Carl Eppler, Kacey L. Faughnan, James Wesley Fischer, Donna H. Fletcher, Amber Floyd, Elizabeth H. Friedman, Mary L. Fullington, Jonda M. Gaudin, Hal A. Gerber, William I. Gibbons, Jr, William Warren Gibson, Harris A. Gilbert, Sharon L. Gold, C. Tyson Gorman, Karen J. Greenwell, Matthew P. Gunn, Kevin J. Hable, Stephen C. Hallm, G. Alexander Hamilton, Brittany L. Hampton, Lee A. Harkavy, Sussan P. Harshbarger, K. Gregory Haynes, Robert A. Heath, Charlotte L. Hendrick, Julie Sneed Herhhy, J. Lawson Hester, Michelle Tolle High, Daniel F. Hitchcock, Marshall L. Hix, James T. Hodge, Elise C. Hofer, William H. Hollander, Richard M. Hopgood, Edwin S. Hopson, Michael D. Hornback, H. Carl Horneman, Odell Horton, Robert K. Imperial, Franklin K. Jelsma, Kevin L. Johns, Barry K. Jones, Jack G. Jones, Jr, Walter M. Jones, Benjamin T. Keller, Donald J. Kelly, Henry E. Kinser, Glen M. Krebs, Steven L. Lacey, Jami K. Lazarov, Byron E. Leet, Michael I. Less, Margaret Young Levi, Clifton M. Lipman, Jason A. Lopp, Thomas J. Luber, Matthew M. Lubozynski, Kathie McDonald-McClure, Sherri P. McIntyre, Erin Brisbay McMahon, Douglas L. McSwain, Francis J. Mellen, Jr, Christopher A. Melton, Barbara Webb Menefee, George J. Miller, Robert F. Miller, Robert S. Mink, Lynn N. Minton, Cynthia H. Mohon, Walter R. Morris, Jr, Vonda K. Motsinger, Rachel K. Mulloy, Theodore T. Myre, Jr, Harry E. Neblett, Jr, S. Kay Nichols, James A. Nitsche, James Robert Norris, Leila G. O'Carra, John S. Osborn, Jr, Chelsea K. Painter, William S. Parks, Deborah H. Patterson, V. Paige Paulett, Robert J. Penta, Elizabeth E. Perkins, James L. Pettis, III, Clifford D. Pierce, Jr, M. Stephen Pitt, Sherry P. Porter, Grover C. Potts, Jr, Caryn F. Price, Stephen R. Price, Sr, Susanne C. Pugh, Andrew J. Pulliam, Edwin S. Pyle, Richard C. Raines, Joseph B. Reafsnyder, Frank H. Reeves, Glen G. Reid, John P. Reisz, Jordan E. Reitler, Boyd L. Rhodes, Jr, W. Craig Robertson, III, Martin Rockwell, J. Matt San Roman, Justin W. Ross, Arthur A. Rouse, Robert S. Ryan, S. Joseph Sabatini, Jason D. Salomon, Courtney Ross Samford, B. Anthony Saunders, Theresa K. Schrader, George L. Seay, Jr, David W. Seewer, Ekundayo Seton, Harnid H. Sheikh, Jr, Stacey L. Showalter, Herbert D. Sledd, J. Brooken Smith, Virginia Hamilton Snell, Daniel C. Soldato, R. Joseph Stennis, Jr, R. Benjamin Straus, David L. Swilley, John E. Tarrant, Mary Lauren Teague, Elizabeth J. Tedesco, Laura H. Therlmann, Angela Thompson, Cynthia J. Tobin, Lisa E. Underwood, Kathryn K. Van Namen, Sarah K. Vandegrift, Sara Veeneman, Michael B. Vincenti, Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr, John Knox Walkup, Wilson W. Wyatt, Wyatt Tarrant & Combs LLP. Replies due by 6/1/2015. (Painter, Chelsea)
May 12, 2015 Filing 24 Proposed Order re #22 MOTION for Leave to by PNC Bank. (Zelli, Anthony)
May 7, 2015 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant PNC Bank Responses due by 6/1/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (MLG)
May 7, 2015 Filing 22 ALTERNATIVE MOTION for Leave to respond to plaintiff's complaint out of timeby Defendant PNC Bank Responses due by 6/1/2015 (MLG)
May 7, 2015 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by PNC Bank. Replies due by 5/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (MLG)
May 7, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Zelli on behalf of PNC Bank (MLG)
May 5, 2015 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Deaconess Hospital. (Watts, Katherine)
May 1, 2015 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by James Robert Norris. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Overruling Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment) (Norris, James)
April 30, 2015 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Gregory S. Berman, John P. Brice, John Brice, Byron N. Brown, IV, Robert J. Brown, Allison Grogan Buckley, Connie S. Bueter, J. Mark Burton, David A. Calhoun, Leo F. Camp, Andrew B. Campbell, H. Alexander Campbell, J. Larry Cashen, Carole D. Christian, Frank F. Chuppe, Kenneth F. Clark, Jr, Lara Ashley Coleman, Bert T. Combs, Stewart E. Conner, James L. Coorssen, Jean H. Coppenbarger, Cornelius E. Coryell, II, Robert E. Craddock, Jr, Robert L. Crawford, Jason E. Dare, Jennifer J. Daum, Gordon B. Davidson, Lesly A.R. Davis, Debra H. Dawahare, Lisa C. DeJaco, M.E. Buck Dougherty, III, Bruce K. Dudley, Parker W. Duncan, Thomas R. Dyer, Amanda Warford Edge, Lori Payne Eisele, Carl Eppler, Kacey L. Faughnan, James Wesley Fischer, Donna H. Fletcher, Amber Floyd, Elizabeth H. Friedman, Mary L. Fullington, Jonda M. Gaudin, Hal A. Gerber, William I. Gibbons, Jr, William Warren Gibson, Harris A. Gilbert, Sharon L. Gold, C. Tyson Gorman, Karen J. Greenwell, Matthew P. Gunn, Kevin J. Hable, Stephen C. Hallm, G. Alexander Hamilton, Brittany L. Hampton, Lee A. Harkavy, Sussan P. Harshbarger, K. Gregory Haynes, Robert A. Heath, Charlotte I. Hendrick, Julie Sneed Herhhy, J. Lawson Hester, Michelle Tolle High, Daniel F. Hitchcock, Marshall L. Hix, James T. Hodge, Elise C. Hofer, William H. Hollander, Richard M. Hopgood, Edwin S. Hopson, Michael D. Hornback, H. Carl Horneman, Odell Horton, Robert K. Imperial, Franklin K. Jelsma, Kevin L. Johns, Barry K. Jones, Jack G. Jones, Jr, Walter M. Jones, Benjamin T. Keller, Donald J. Kelly, Henry E. Kinser, Glen M. Krebs, Steven L. Lacey, Jami K. Lazarov, Byron E. Leet, Michael I. Less, Margaret Young Levi, Clifton M. Lipman, Jason A. Lopp, Thomas J. Luber, Matthew M. Lubozynski, Kathie McDonald-McClure, Sherri P. McIntyre, Erin Brisbay McMahon, Douglas L. McSwain, Francis J. Mellen, Jr, Christopher A. Melton, Barbara Webb Menefee, George J. Miller, Robert F. Miller, Robert S. Mink, Lynn N. Minton, Cynthia H. Mohon, Walter R. Morris, Jr, Vonda K. Motsinger, Rachel K. Mulloy, Theodore T. Myre, Jr, Harry E. Neblett, Jr, S. Kay Nichols, James A. Nitsche, Richard Northern, Leila G. O'Carra, John S. Osborn, Jr, Chelsea K. Painter, William S. Parks, Deborah H. Patterson, V. Paige Paulett, Robert J. Penta, Elizabeth E. Perkins, James L. Pettis, III, Clifford D. Pierce, Jr, M. Stephen Pitt, Sherry P. Porter, Grover C. Potts, Jr, Caryn F. Price, Stephen R. Price, Sr, Susanne C. Pugh, Andrew J. Pulliam, Edwin S. Pyle, Richard C. Raines, Joseph B. Reafsnyder, Frank H. Reeves, Glen G. Reid, John P. Reisz, Jordan E. Reitler, Boyd L. Rhodes, Jr, W. Craig Robertson, III, Martin Rockwell, J. Matt San Roman, Justin W. Ross, Arthur A. Rouse, Robert S. Ryan, S. Joseph Sabatini, Jason D. Salomon, Courtney Ross Samford, B. Anthony Saunders, Theresa K. Schrader, George L. Seay, Jr, David W. Seewer, Ekundayo Seton, Harnid H. Sheikh, Jr, Stacey L. Showalter, Herbert D. Sledd, J. Brooken Smith, Virginia Hamilton Snell, Daniel C. Soldato, R. Joseph Stennis, Jr, R. Benjamin Straus, David L. Swilley, John E. Tarrant, Mary Lauren Teague, Elizabeth J. Tedesco, Laura H. Therlmann, Angela Thompson, Cynthia J. Tobin, Lisa E. Underwood, Kathryn K. Van Namen, Sarah K. Vandegrift, Sara Veeneman, Michael B. Vincenti, Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr, John Knox Walkup, Wilson W. Wyatt, Wyatt Tarrant & Combs LLP. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Painter, Chelsea)
April 30, 2015 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Kerri Bruckner, Amy Jensen, Lerner Sampson & Rothfus, Stephanie Maguire. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (DeBlasis, Rick)
April 22, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant James Robert Norris Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order On Motion To Dismiss) (Norris, James)
April 21, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION Emergency Motion to Hold in Abeyance by Plaintiff Carol Roberts Responses due by 5/15/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (DJT)
April 21, 2015 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carol Roberts. Replies due by 5/8/2015. (DJT)
April 21, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Plaintiff Carol Roberts Responses due by 5/15/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DJT)
April 21, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Carol Roberts Responses due by 5/15/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (DJT)
April 7, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Deaconess Hospital Responses due by 5/1/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Watts, Katherine)
April 2, 2015 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Kerri Bruckner, Amy Jensen, Lerner Sampson & Rothfus, Stephanie Maguire Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Docket, #2 Exhibit B-Foreclosure Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Answer, #4 Exhibit D-Motion for Recusal, #5 Exhibit E-Order Denying Recusal, #6 Exhibit F-Judgment Order of Sale, #7 Exhibit G-Docket for Case Against Aquascapes, #8 Exhibit H-Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (DeBlasis, Rick)
April 2, 2015 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lerner Sampson & Rothfus. (DeBlasis, Rick)
March 31, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Gregory S. Berman, John P. Brice, John Brice, Byron N. Brown, IV, Robert J. Brown, Robert J. Brown, Allison Grogan Buckley, Connie S. Bueter, J. Mark Burton, David A. Calhoun, Leo F. Camp, Andrew B. Campbell, H. Alexander Campbell, J. Larry Cashen, Carole D. Christian, Frank F. Chuppe, Kenneth F. Clark, Jr, Lara Ashley Coleman, Bert T. Combs, Stewart E. Conner, James L. Coorssen, Jean H. Coppenbarger, Cornelius E. Coryell, II, Robert E. Craddock, Jr, Robert L. Crawford, Jason E. Dare, Jennifer J. Daum, Gordon B. Davidson, Lesly A.R. Davis, Debra H. Dawahare, Lisa C. DeJaco, M.E. Buck Dougherty, III, Bruce K. Dudley, Parker W. Duncan, Thomas R. Dyer, Amanda Warford Edge, Lori Payne Eisele, Carl Eppler, Kacey L. Faughnan, James Wesley Fischer, Donna H. Fletcher, Amber Floyd, Elizabeth H. Friedman, Mary L. Fullington, Jonda M. Gaudin, Hal A. Gerber, William I. Gibbons, Jr, William Warren Gibson, Harris A. Gilbert, Sharon L. Gold, C. Tyson Gorman, Karen J. Greenwell, Matthew P. Gunn, Kevin J. Hable, Stephen C. Hallm, G. Alexander Hamilton, Brittany L. Hampton, Lee A. Harkavy, Sussan P. Harshbarger, K. Gregory Haynes, Robert A. Heath, Charlotte L. Hendrick, Charlotte I. Hendrick, Julie Sneed Herhhy, J. Lawson Hester, Michelle Tolle High, Daniel F. Hitchcock, Marshall L. Hix, James T. Hodge, Elise C. Hofer, William H. Hollander, Richard M. Hopgood, Edwin S. Hopson, Michael D. Hornback, H. Carl Horneman, Odell Horton, Robert K. Imperial, Franklin K. Jelsma, Kevin L. Johns, Barry K. Jones, Jack G. Jones, Jr, Walter M. Jones, Benjamin T. Keller, Donald J. Kelly, Henry E. Kinser, Glen M. Krebs, Steven L. Lacey, Jami K. Lazarov, Byron E. Leet, Michael I. Less, Margaret Young Levi, Clifton M. Lipman, Jason A. Lopp, Thomas J. Luber, Matthew M. Lubozynski, Kathie McDonald-McClure, Sherri P. McIntyre, Erin Brisbay McMahon, Douglas L. McSwain, Francis J. Mellen, Jr, Christopher A. Melton, Barbara Webb Menefee, George J. Miller, Robert F. Miller, Robert S. Mink, Lynn N. Minton, Cynthia H. Mohon, Walter R. Morris, Jr, Vonda K. Motsinger, Rachel K. Mulloy, Theodore T. Myre, Jr, Harry E. Neblett, Jr, James A. Nitsche, Richard Northern, Leila G. O'Carra, John S. Osborn, Jr, Chelsea K. Painter, William S. Parks, Deborah H. Patterson, V. Paige Paulett, Robert J. Penta, Elizabeth E. Perkins, James L. Pettis, III, Clifford D. Pierce, Jr, M. Stephen Pitt, Sherry P. Porter, Grover C. Potts, Jr, Caryn F. Price, Stephen R. Price, Sr, Susanne C. Pugh, Andrew J. Pulliam, Edwin S. Pyle, Richard C. Raines, Joseph B. Reafsnyder, Frank H. Reeves, Glen G. Reid, John P. Reisz, Boyd L. Rhodes, Jr, W. Craig Robertson, III, Martin Rockwell, J. Matt San Roman, Justin W. Ross, Arthur A. Rouse, Robert S. Ryan, S. Joseph Sabatini, Jason D. Salomon, Courtney Ross Samford, B. Anthony Saunders, Theresa K. Schrader, George L. Seay, Jr, David W. Seewer, Ekundayo Seton, Harnid H. Sheikh, Jr, Stacey L. Showalter, Herbert D. Sledd, J. Brooken Smith, Virginia Hamilton Snell, Daniel C. Soldato, William S. Solmson, R. Joseph Stennis, Jr, R. Benjamin Straus, David L. Swilley, John E. Tarrant, Mary Lauren Teague, Elizabeth J. Tedesco, Laura H. Therlmann, Angela Thompson, Angela Thompson, Cynthia J. Tobin, Lisa E. Underwood, Kathryn K. Van Namen, Sarah K. Vandegrift, Sara Veeneman, Michael B. Vincenti, Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr, John Knox Walkup, Wilson W. Wyatt, Wyatt Tarrant & Combs LLP Responses due by 4/24/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Painter, Chelsea)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale. Within 30 days Plaintiff shall pay $400 fee for initiating civil action or file completed application to proceed without prepayment. Clerk is directed to send plaintiff application. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply will result in dismissal. cc: plaintiff pro se (JAC)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. cc: counsel, NT (JBM)
March 17, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery AND MOTION for Full Disclosure by Plaintiff Carol Roberts Responses due by 4/10/2015 (DJT)
March 17, 2015 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Carol Roberts Responses due by 4/10/2015 (DJT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2015: #1 Exhibit) (DJT).
March 17, 2015 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
March 17, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carol Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 - Common Law Trust, #3 Exhibit State Court Orders, #4 Exhibit A Mortgage Is Not a Contract, #5 Exhibit A Loan: A Deposit of Money by A Customer With Banker (Page 21 missing), #6 Exhibit Oath Required to Take Office, #7 Exhibit Now about those Oaths and the Public Hazard Bond that goes with them, #8 Exhibit Borrower Signature Page) (DJT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2015: #9 Exhibit Court of Chancery) (DJT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Wethington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wethington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wethington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Mink
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra H. Dawahare
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael I. Less
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kacey L. Faughnan
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Gregory Haynes
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Ross Samford
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grover C. Potts, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Brooken Smith
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth E. Perkins
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Brice
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Knox Walkup
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin K. Jelsma
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.E. Buck Dougherty, III
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry E. Kinser
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton M. Lipman
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wedding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lauren Teague
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris A. Gilbert
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri P. McIntyre
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Osborn, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Nick Burlew, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen M. Krebs
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Meisenheider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart E. Conner
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F. Miller
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelius E. Coryell, II
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyatt Tarrant & Combs LLP
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Hopgood
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Pulliam
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth F. Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Taul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Tyson Gorman
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas L. McSwain
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Kuegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami K. Lazarov
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Warren Gibson
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Paige Paulett
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer J. Daum
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Hollander
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin S. Pyle
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah H. Patterson
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte L. Hendrick
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathie McDonald-McClure
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Grogan Buckley
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo F. Camp
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew B. Campbell
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Van Meter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn K. Van Namen
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Demchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTIV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa E. Underwood
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore T. Myre, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George L. Seay, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole D. Christian
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lerner Sampson & Rothfuss
Represented By: Rick D. DeBlasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford D. Pierce, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall L. Hix
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesly A.R. Davis
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Seewer
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank
Represented By: Anthony M. Zelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Imperial
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Hable
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank H. Reeves
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph B. Reafsnyder
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wesley Fischer
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Hamilton Snell
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Luber
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Emberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Larry Cashen
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan E. Reitler
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry P. Porter
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (Bobby) Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Matt San Roman
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Brisbay McMahon
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Crawford
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte I. Hendrick
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robert Norris
Represented By: James Robert Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth J. Tedesco
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn N. Minton
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Reisz
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Vorder-Bruegge, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Vincenti
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Joseph Stennis, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deaconess Hospital
Represented By: Katherine T. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie S. Bueter
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerri Bruckner
Represented By: Rick D. DeBlasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Lisby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin L. Johns
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal A. Gerber
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owner of Aquascapes Pools & Spas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna H. Fletcher
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R. Morris, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Muffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee A. Harkavy
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George J. Miller
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Alexander Hamilton
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Munday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew P. Gunn
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur A. Rouse
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Ryan
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Maguire
Represented By: Rick D. DeBlasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elise C. Hofer
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Eppler
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William I. Gibbons, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevenson Land & Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Raines
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel K. Mulloy
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin T. Keller
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Solmson
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sussan P. Harshbarger
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Nitsche
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason E. Dare
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Heath
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd L. Rhodes, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Payne Eisele
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah K. Vandegrift
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa K. Schrader
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon L. Gold
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Melton
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C. Soldato
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Swilley
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory S. Berman
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon B. Davidson
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea K. Painter
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron E. Leet
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Tarrant
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert D. Sledd
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Thompson
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekundayo Seton
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Tolle High
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson W. Wyatt
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Northern
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Kay Nichols
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Calhoun
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason D. Salomon
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Warford Edge
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Sneed Herhhy
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura H. Therlmann
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. Hallm
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia H. Mohon
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Craig Robertson, III
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Hornback
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel F. Hitchcock
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Eric Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Webb Menefee
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Starnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean H. Coppenbarger
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan Mountjoy & Stainback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank F. Chuppe
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason A. Lopp
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth H. Friedman
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey L. Showalter
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Feldpausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack G. Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany L. Hampton
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker W. Duncan
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Brown
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Wethington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonda K. Motsinger
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Castlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis J. Mellen, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanne C. Pugh
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia J. Tobin
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Lacey
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Dyer
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Alexander Campbell
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin S. Hopson
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Pettis, III
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Hocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Benjamin Straus
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Ashley Coleman
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leila G. O'Carra
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin W. Ross
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonda M. Gaudin
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Craddock, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stephen Pitt
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lawson Hester
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Penta
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Young Levi
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brice
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron N. Brown, IV
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry K. Jones
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry E. Neblett, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Floyd
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caryn F. Price
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mark Burton
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Joseph Sabatini
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert T. Combs
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa C. DeJaco
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary L. Fullington
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harnid H. Sheikh, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Rockwell
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen G. Reid
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Price, Sr.
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter M. Jones
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Veeneman
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Dimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen J. Greenwell
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Jensen
Represented By: Rick D. DeBlasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Anthony Saunders
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odell Horton
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Hodge
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce K. Dudley
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Coorssen
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew M. Lubozynski
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Parks
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Carl Horneman
Represented By: Chelsea K. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?