ADA-ES, Inc. v. Big Rivers Electric Corporation

Plaintiff: ADA-ES, Inc.
Defendant: Big Rivers Electric Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00016
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Owensboro Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: H. Brent Brennenstuhl
Presiding Judge: Joseph H. McKinley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/24/2019: The Plaintiff's Motion 59 for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED; Defendant's Cross-Motion 63 for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED; The Defendant's Rule 56(d) Motion 63 is GRANTED; Plaintiff's Motion 66 to Strike is DENIED. cc: Counsel(JM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 1/18/2019 granting 70 Motion for Leave to file Counterclaim. Pursuant to this order, the Clerk of the Court is directed to file the proposed counterclaim. cc: Counsel (JM)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER SUA SPONTE TRANSFERRING CASE. ORDERED: 1. This case is sua sponte TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Kentucky; 2. To the extent that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 27 argues that Plaintiff's Complaint 20 should be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2), it is DENIED as moot; and 3. To the extent that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 27 argues that Plaintiff's Complaint 20 should be dismissed for failure to state a claim under Rule 12(b)(6), it is DENIED without prejudice, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/12/2018. (dhans, ) [Transferred from cod on 2/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADA-ES, Inc. v. Big Rivers Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADA-ES, Inc.
Represented By: Anna S. Day
Represented By: Daniel E. Fuchs
Represented By: Perry L. Glantz
Represented By: G. Bruce Stigger
Represented By: Jean Maron Terry
Represented By: Daniel C. Wennogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Rivers Electric Corporation
Represented By: Glenn L. Burton
Represented By: Edward Tipton Depp
Represented By: Joseph N. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?