Redmon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Delena Ann Redmon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv00044
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405rs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 6/27/2019; Social Security Submission due by 9/25/2019. cc: counsel (JM)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. pursuant to General Order 2018-02 for all further proceedings. cc: counsel, ES (JM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD received from Social Security (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non-Disability Related Development, #6 Disability Related Development, #7 Medical Records Part 1 of 2, #8 Medical Records Part 2 of 2, #9 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #10 Payment Documents and Decisions, #11 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #12 Non-Disability Related Development, #13 Disability Related Development) by Commissioner of Social Security. (Gilbert, L.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Gilbert, L.)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 5/10/2019. (DJT)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to SSA, #2 Summons as to Attorney General) (DJT)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2849444., filed by Delena Ann Redmon. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delena Ann Redmon
Represented By: M. Michele Cecil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?