Conrath v. The Webstaurant Store, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Conrath
Defendant: The Webstaurant Store, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00047
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 3 filed by The Webstaurant Store, Inc.. (Strause, Randall)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Webstaurant Store, Inc.. (Strause, Randall)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 3 by Plaintiff David Conrath (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand for Arbitration, Filed June 17, 2019, #2 Proposed Order ) (Foster, Mark)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Conrath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand for Arbitration, Filed June 17, 2019) (Foster, Mark)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Webstaurant Store, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement, #3 Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss) (Strause, Randall)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE of email confirmation as to Mark N. Foster re #6 Request for Fee Refund. (MLG)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Fee Refund by David Conrath. (Foster, Mark)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Conrath. The Webstaurant Store, Inc. served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Foster, Mark)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 5/7/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Webstaurant Store, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Webstaurant Store, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2860609, filed by David Conrath. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Abbigail Jones, Itself Attaching Email from Jasmine Lagor, #3 Exhibit Email from Defendant's Counsel Acknowledging that Customer Solution, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent to Join Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b)) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrath v. The Webstaurant Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Webstaurant Store, Inc.
Represented By: Randall S. Strause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Conrath
Represented By: Mark N. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?