Robinson v. Commissioner
Petitioner: Sarah Elizabeth Robinson
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv00053
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 6/26/2019. (DJT)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General) (DJT)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Tendered Summons by Sarah Elizabeth Robinson re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons Commissioner Summons, #2 Summons Attorney General Summons, #3 Summons US Attorney Summons) (Wilkey, Clay)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Summons not tendered with Complaint Filing. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/6/2019. (DJT)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. (DJT)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2870866., filed by Sarah Elizabeth Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sarah Elizabeth Robinson
Represented By: Clay F. Wilkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?