Oldham v. Land O'Frost, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tina Oldham
Defendant: Land O'Frost, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00062
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Tina Oldham (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Become Party Plaintiff -- Eva Kelly) (Foster, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Land O'Frost, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Peggy Szumski, #3 Proposed Order) (Wright, Derrick)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Land O'Frost, Inc.. (Wright, Derrick)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 7/18/2019 granting #10 Motion for Attorney Michael A. Correll to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 7/18/2019 granting #9 Motion for Attorney Hannah L. Sorcic to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Tina Oldham (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Become Party Plaintiff of Violet Rickard) (Foster, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Michael A. Correll to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2905569. by Defendant Land O'Frost, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B-Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wright, Derrick)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Hannah L. Sorcic to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2905567. by Defendant Land O'Frost, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wright, Derrick)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/2/19: Defendant shall have until and through 7/26/2019 to respond to the Complaint. cc: Counsel (DJT)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Land O'Frost, Inc.. (Wright, Derrick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Land O'Frost, Inc.. (Wright, Derrick)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Oldham. Land O'Frost, Inc. served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Foster, Mark)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 6/13/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Land O'Frost, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Land O'Frost, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2884755., filed by Tina Oldham. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Employee Handbook, #3 Exhibit Page from Defendant's Website, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent to Join Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b)) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oldham v. Land O'Frost, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Oldham
Represented By: Mark N. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land O'Frost, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah L. Sorcic
Represented By: Derrick T. Wright
Represented By: Michael A. Correll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?