United States of America v. Gipson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Alliance Resource Properties LLC, Clinton D. Gipson, Sr., Beneficial Kentucky, Inc. and Sharon C. Gipson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00082
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alliance Resource Properties LLC. (Stilz, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Campbell, William)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Sharon C. Gipson served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Campbell, William)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Alliance Resource Properties LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Campbell, William)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Clinton D. Gipson, Sr served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Campbell, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Beneficial Kentucky, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Campbell, William)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 7/15/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alliance Resource Properties LLC, Beneficial Kentucky, Inc., Clinton D. Gipson, Sr, Sharon C. Gipson. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Sharon Gipson, #2 Summons as to Beneficial Kentucky, #3 Summons as to Alliance Resource Properties) (DJT)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Alliance Resource Properties LLC, Beneficial Kentucky, Inc., Clinton D. Gipson, Sr, Sharon C. Gipson, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #5 Exhibit D-Judgment Lien, #6 Exhibit E-Coal Lease Agreement) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gipson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Resource Properties LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Stilz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton D. Gipson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Kentucky, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon C. Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?