Nyxson, LLC et al v. Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC
Plaintiff: Burke's Westgate Stores, Inc. and Nyxson, LLC
Defendant: Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00106
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/15/2019. The parties having filed a Notice of Settlement in Principle (DN 12); IT IS ORDERED the Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 is REMANDED from the Court's docket. Should the settlement not be perfected within 45 days, a Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be conducted on 12/4/2019 at 10:00 AM, CST, before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (KLL)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement in Principle by Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cox, Jared)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Burke's Westgate Stores, Inc., Nyxson, LLC. (Stainback, Frank)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/23/2019 granting #8 Motion to Withdraw attorney Sean S. Land as counsel of record for Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants. cc: Counsel(JM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC. (Cox, Jared)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw of Sean Land as Counsel for Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs Burke's Westgate Stores, Inc., Nyxson, LLC, Counter Defendants Burke's Westgate Stores, Inc., Nyxson, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents, #2 Proposed Order) (Stainback, Frank)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Stainback, Jr on behalf of Burke's Westgate Stores, Inc., Burke's Westgate Stores, Inc., Nyxson, LLC, Nyxson, LLC (Stainback, Frank)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/30/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/4/2019.cc: counsel, KL (JM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Daviess Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/26/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
August 26, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Burke's Westgate Stores, Inc., Nyxson, LLC by Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC. (DJT)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC. (DJT)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM FILED] by Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC from Daviess Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00796. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2931221, filed by Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3 - Answer to Complaint and Counterclaims) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyxson, LLC et al v. Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towne Square Mall Realty Holding, LLC
Represented By: Kyle W. Miller
Represented By: Jared A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burke's Westgate Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Sean S. Land
Represented By: Frank Stainback, Jr.
Represented By: R. Michael Sullivan
Represented By: L. Christopher Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyxson, LLC
Represented By: Sean S. Land
Represented By: Frank Stainback, Jr.
Represented By: R. Michael Sullivan
Represented By: L. Christopher Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?