Clark et al v. Stone et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Clark and Genetta Clark
Defendant: Douglas Hazelwood, Bernadette Stone, Adam Meier, Marcus Haycraft, Andrew Beshear and Catherine Campbell
Case Number: 4:2019cv00166
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction regarding offical capacity claims filed by Catherine Campbell, Marcus Haycraft, Douglas Hazelwood, Adam Meier, Bernadette Stone. (Irvin, D.)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/30/19; granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline to reply is hereby extended until 1/9/2020 cc: Counsel(DJT)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Response to Motion, opposing dismissal of official capacity claims by Defendants Catherine Campbell, Marcus Haycraft, Douglas Hazelwood, Adam Meier, Bernadette Stone (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting extension) (Irvin, D.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Genetta Clark, Jacob Clark(as guardian, next friend and guardian of H.C., a minor), Jacob Clark. (Wiest, Christopher)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Marcus Haycraft, Douglas Hazelwood, Adam Meier, Bernadette Stone (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order dismissing official capacity claims and official capacity defendants) (Irvin, D.)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Clark(as guardian, next friend and guardian of H.C., a minor), Jacob Clark, Genetta Clark. Andrew Beshear served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019. (Wiest, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Clark(as guardian, next friend and guardian of H.C., a minor), Jacob Clark, Genetta Clark. Douglas Hazelwood served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Wiest, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Clark(as guardian, next friend and guardian of H.C., a minor), Jacob Clark, Genetta Clark. Bernadette Stone served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Clark(as guardian, next friend and guardian of H.C., a minor), Jacob Clark, Genetta Clark. Catherine Campbell served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Clark(as guardian, next friend and guardian of H.C., a minor), Jacob Clark, Genetta Clark. Marcus Haycraft served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/20/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Beshear, Catherine Campbell, Marcus Haycraft, Douglas Hazelwood, Adam Meier, Bernadette Stone. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Catherine Campbell, #2 Summons as to Douglas Hazelwood, #3 Summons as to Marcus Haycraft, #4 Summons as to Adam Meier, #5 Summons as to Andy Beshear) (DJT)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Beshear, Catherine Campbell, Marcus Haycraft, Douglas Hazelwood, Adam Meier, Bernadette Stone Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2987927., filed by Jacob Clark(as guardian, next friend and guardian of H.C., a minor), Jacob Clark, Genetta Clark. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - photos by Stone, #3 Affidavit VERIFICATION OF JACOB CLARK) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Stone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Hazelwood
Represented By: Kimberly J. Hawthorne
Represented By: Olivia M. Peterson
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Stone
Represented By: Kimberly J. Hawthorne
Represented By: Olivia M. Peterson
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Meier
Represented By: Kimberly J. Hawthorne
Represented By: Olivia M. Peterson
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Haycraft
Represented By: Kimberly J. Hawthorne
Represented By: Olivia M. Peterson
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Beshear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Campbell
Represented By: Kimberly J. Hawthorne
Represented By: Olivia M. Peterson
Represented By: D. Brent Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Clark
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher D. Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genetta Clark
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher D. Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?