D'Amico v. Ohio Security Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Anna M. D'Amico
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Co.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00045
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Requests by Anna M. D'Amico (Rhoads, Christopher)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER from proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl; Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/4/2020: Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 8/28/2020. Daubert & Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2021. Discovery due by 12/1/2020. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 11/2/2020. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 10/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 11/6/2020. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 4/10/2020. Telephonic Conference set for 12/7/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc:counsel (DJT)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S RULE 26 DISCLOSURE by Ohio Security Insurance Co. (Almasalkhi, Aida)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Anna M. D'Amico (Rhoads, Christopher)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ohio Security Insurance Co.. (Almasalkhi, Aida)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/20/20; Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 4/10/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.cc: Counsel, CM- HBB (DJT)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Daviess Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/18/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Corporate Parent The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Ohio Security Insurance Co.. (DJT)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Ohio Security Insurance Co. from Daviess Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01229. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3067339, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Amico v. Ohio Security Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna M. D'Amico
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Co.
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Represented By: Aida Almasalkhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?