Revlett et al v. Robert Dietrick Co Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anita Revlett, Frank Revlett, Heather Revlett and Taylor Revlett
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company, Robert Dietrick Co Inc., Arthur S. Kempf, FCCI Insurance Company and Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00106
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Arthur S. Kempf, Robert Dietrick Co Inc. re #17 Notice (Other) (Maclin, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 DEPOSITION of Casey Thurman taken on 09/15/2020 by Arthur S. Kempf, Robert Dietrick Co Inc.. (Maclin, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Arthur S. Kempf, Robert Dietrick Co Inc.. (Maclin, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/6/20: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 8/27/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Arthur S. Kempf, Robert Dietrick Co Inc.. (Maclin, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Requests to Defendants Robert Dietrick Co., Inc. & Arthur Kempf by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Andrews, Jennifer)
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Direct Insurance Company. by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Andrews, Jennifer)
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Arthur S. Kempf, Robert Dietrick Co Inc. by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Andrews, Jennifer)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF FCCI AND GEICO filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Arthur S. Kempf, Anita Revlett, Frank Revlett, Heather Revlett, Taylor Revlett, and Robert Dietrick Co Inc. (KD)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT, ROBERT DIETRICK CO., INC. AND DEFENDANT, ARTHUR S. KEMPF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REDACTED JOINT STIPULATION TO PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF FCCI AND GEICO (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/17/2020. cc: All Counsel of Record (KD)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Joint Stipulation by Defendants Arthur S. Kempf, Robert Dietrick Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Joint Stipulation to Partial Dismissal of FCCI and GEICO, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Maclin, Robert)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/14/2020 - The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to RESTRICT electronic access to the Joint Stipulation [DN #10 ] to Court users and participants in the case and is FURTHER DIRECTED to include only the minor's initials in the caption of the case on the court's electronic filing system. Defendants shall file a motion to seal the document or a motion seeking leave to file a redacted version of the document along with copies of the redacted version within 7 days of the entry date of this Order. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal of FCCI and GEICO by Arthur S. Kempf, Robert Dietrick Co Inc.. (Maclin, Robert)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (EBOC) signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/13/20 granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Redacted Notice of Removal and Exhibits. cc: Counsel(DJT)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Arthur S. Kempf, Robert Dietrick Co Inc.. (Maclin, Robert)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File a Redacted Notice of Removal and Exhibits by Defendant Robert Dietrick Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Removal (State Court), #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Consents, #5 Proposed Order) (Maclin, Robert)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/6/20 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Arthur S. Kempf, Robert Dietrick Co Inc. : The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to RESTRICT electronic access to these documents [DN #1 and Exhibit A to DN #1 ] to Court users and participants in the case and is FURTHER DIRECTED to include only the minor's initials in the caption of the case on the court's electronic filing system. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall file a motion to seal the documents or a motion seeking leave to file redacted versions of the documents along with copies of the redacted versions within 7 days of the entry date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendants file a motion seeking leave to file redacted versions of the documents, the motion will be GRANTED, and the Clerk will replace the documents containing personal identifiers with the redacted versions. cc: Counsel (DJT)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Henderson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/6/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Dietrick Co Inc.. (DJT)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Robert Dietrick Co Inc., Arthur S. Kempf from Henderson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-311. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3133515, filed by Robert Dietrick Co Inc., Arthur S. Kempf. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal (State Court), #4 Exhibit C - Consents to Remove) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revlett et al v. Robert Dietrick Co Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles H. Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dietrick Co Inc.
Represented By: Drake W. Staples
Represented By: Robert E. Maclin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur S. Kempf
Represented By: Drake W. Staples
Represented By: Robert E. Maclin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCCI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Revlett
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Revlett
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Revlett
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Revlett
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?