Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local Unions 181, 320 and TVA Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. May Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 181 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local Unions 181, 320 and TVA Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 181
Defendant: May Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00116
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 9/2/20: No later than 9/23/2020, counsel for the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order. If the parties agree to the schedule, the Court will enter the proposed scheduling order without further hearing. cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by May Contracting, Inc.. (Moore, James)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by May Contracting, Inc.. (Moore, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local Unions 181, 320 and TVA Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 181, Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 181 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund. May Contracting, Inc. served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Arnold, Jennie)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/22/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to May Contracting, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against May Contracting, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3145224., filed by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local Unions 181, 320 and TVA Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 181, Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 181 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-CBA, #3 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Central Pension Fund Trust, #5 Exhibit D - Health and Welfare Trust, #6 Exhibit E - Joint Apprenticeship Trust) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local Unions 181, 320 and TVA Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. May Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 181 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Jennie G. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local Unions 181, 320 and TVA Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Jennie G. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: Jennie G. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 181
Represented By: Jennie G. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?