Radford v. Brady
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Radford
Defendant: Amy Brady
Case Number: 4:2020cv00138
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Amy Brady (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Hopgood, J.)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/26/2020: IT IS ORDERED within 30 days from date of entry of Order, 1) Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint containing all claims he wants to bring against all Defendants he wants to sue; and 2) Plaintiff shall complete a summons form for each Defendant he names in the amended complaint. Clerk is directed to place instant case number and "Amended" on form for filing 42:1983 complaint form and sent to Plaintiff for his completion. Plaintiff is warned his failure to comply within the 30 day period will result in dismissal of the action for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with Order of the Court.cc:counsel, Plaintiff pro se w/ amended complaint form/summons (EAS)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (EBOC) signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/25/20 ; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff(pro se), Finance, HCDC (DJT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher L. Radford. (DJT)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher L. Radford (DJT)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher L. Radford. (DJT)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher L. Radford (DJT)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amy Brady, filed by Christopher L. Radford. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radford v. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Brady
Represented By: J. Christopher Hopgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?