United States of America v. Boyd et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Darrill S. Boyd and Terri L. Boyd
Not Classified By Court: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 4:2020cv00139
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/15/20 ; granting #6 Warning Order. Attorney John David Austin for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel(DJT)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for TERRI L. BOYD by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Darrill S. Boyd served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Campbell, William)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/21/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Darrill S. Boyd, Terri L. Boyd. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Terri L. Boyd) (DJT)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Darrill S. Boyd, Terri L. Boyd, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrill S. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri L. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: John David Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?