Huff Technologies, Inc. v. ASC Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Huff Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: ASC Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00147
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/8/2020 granting #7 . ASC shall have up to and including 11/6/2020 to file its response to Huff's Complaint. cc: Counsel(MNM)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/8/2020: This action is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, K. Lovell (EAS)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order Setting Deadline to Respond to Complaint by ASC Industries, Inc.. (Hagerman, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Huff Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A-Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit Ex B-Revised Purchase Order) (Arnett, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ASC Industries, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JM)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Huff Technologies, Inc. re #3 Notice of Deficiency, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet) (Arnett, Stephen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Civil Cover Sheet not filed nor Summons' Tendered for Defendant. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/14/2020. (DJT)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASC Industries, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3173437., filed by Huff Technologies, Inc.. (DJT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2020: #1 Cover Sheet (provided to the Court on 9/3/2020)) (JM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huff Technologies, Inc. v. ASC Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huff Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASC Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew T. Hagerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?