Canadian National Railway Company et al v. Railmark Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Algoma Central Railway, Inc. and Canadian National Railway Company
Defendant: Railmark Track Works, Inc., Railmark Holdings, Inc., Railmark Rail Services, Inc. and B. Allen Brown, II
Case Number: 4:2020cv00157
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/12/20. cc:counsel (DJT)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/10/2020. The parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal in this matter; IT IS ORDERED the Litigation Plan due on 11/10/2020 and the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 are remanded from the Court's docket. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (KLL)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Canadian National Railway Company. (Fiorilla, John)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Railmark Holdings, Inc. COMPLETED on 10/13/2020. Secretary of State return states Railmark Holdings, Inc. served. (DJT)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Railmark Track Works, Inc. COMPLETED on 10/9/2020. Secretary of State return states 9/29/2020. (MNM)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/6/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/10/2020. cc: counsel, KL (JM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Railmark Track Works, Inc.. (Springer, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Railmark Rail Services, Inc.. (Springer, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Railmark Holdings, Inc.. (Springer, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by B. Allen Brown, II, Railmark Holdings, Inc., Railmark Rail Services, Inc., Railmark Track Works, Inc.. (Springer, Thomas)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Fiorilla on behalf of Canadian National Railway Company (Fiorilla, John)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 9/16/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to B. Allen Brown, II, Railmark Holdings, Inc., Railmark Rail Services, Inc., Railmark Track Works, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). ** ATTESTED COPIES EMAILED THIS DATE TO COUNSEL** (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Railmark Rail Services, #2 Summons as to Railmark Holdings, #3 Summons as to Railmark Track Works) (DJT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Bill Gates for Algoma Central Railway, Inc., Canadian National Railway Company.. (DJT)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B. Allen Brown, II, Railmark Holdings, Inc., Railmark Rail Services, Inc., Railmark Track Works, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3186026., filed by Canadian National Railway Company, Algoma Central Railway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A & B - certified judgment, #3 Exhibit C - federal default judgment, #4 Exhibit D - deposition, #5 Exhibit E - financial results) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canadian National Railway Company et al v. Railmark Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Algoma Central Railway, Inc.
Represented By: Gene F. Zipperle, Jr.
Represented By: John K. Fiorilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: Gene F. Zipperle, Jr.
Represented By: John K. Fiorilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railmark Track Works, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Springer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railmark Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Springer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railmark Rail Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Springer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Allen Brown, II
Represented By: Thomas E. Springer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?