New York Marine and General Insurance Company v. Ingram Barge Company, LLC
Plaintiff: New York Marine and General Insurance Company
Defendant: Meuth Concrete
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Ingram Barge Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00179
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 12/9/20: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 12/30/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/13/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William N. Clark, Jr on behalf of Meuth Concrete (Clark, William)
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #8 Third Party Complaint by Meuth Concrete. (Mayer, Christopher)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Mayer on behalf of Meuth Concrete (Mayer, Christopher)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by New York Marine and General Insurance Company. (Clark, William)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/16/20 granting #9 Motion for attorney William N. Clark, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SRH)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint by New York Marine and General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Summons, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt) (Mayer, Christopher)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Meuth Concrete. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for William N. Clark, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3225469. by Plaintiff New York Marine and General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of William N Clark, Jr., #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Electronic Filing System Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Moiton to Admit Pro Hac) (Mayer, Christopher)
November 11, 2020 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Meuth Concrete, filed by Ingram Barge Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Towage Agreement, #2 Summons) (Miller, C.)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Meuth Concrete by Ingram Barge Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Towage Agreement) (Miller, C.)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/19/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ProSight Specialty Group, Other Affiliate Southwest Marine and General Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Gotham Insurance Company for New York Marine and General Insurance Company. (DJT)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ingram Barge Company, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Mayer on behalf of New York Marine and General Insurance Company (DJT)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ingram Barge Company, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3207610., filed by New York Marine and General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Marine and General Insurance Company v. Ingram Barge Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ingram Barge Company, LLC
Represented By: C. Thomas Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Marine and General Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Mayer
Represented By: William N. Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meuth Concrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?