Baker v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Baker
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00187
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Mays, Laura)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Mays, Laura)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 12/9/20: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 12/30/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/13/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Mays, Laura)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen H. Thomas on behalf of Kenneth E. Baker (Thomas, Stephen)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT(s) re #3 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, #4 Notice of Deficiency (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) by Kenneth E. Baker. (Thomas, Stephen)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/3/2020: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of nondispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint: Civil cover sheet was blank/incomplete. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/10/2020. (JM)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint: Incomplete summons was tendered with the Complaint. (JM)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (JM)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3218866, filed by Kenneth E. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Laura L. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Baker
Represented By: Stephen H. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?