J.M. et al v. Hatfield et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Vannoy and J.M.
Defendant: Anna Brown and Melissa D. Hatfield
Case Number: 4:2021cv00041
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 6/15/21: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 7/6/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/20/2021.cc: Counsel, CM-HBB (DJT)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Melissa D. Hatfield. (Bass, Elizabeth)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed as to Melissa D. Hatfield. SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.M. as to Melissa D. Hatfield, served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. (Holloway, Wendell) Modified docket text on 4/29/2021 (EAS).
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.M. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Holloway, Wendell)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Anna Brown. (Bass, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Hopkins Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 4/21/21: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Anna Brown from Hopkins Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00207. Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0644-3328080, filed by Anna Brown. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Filings, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.M. et al v. Hatfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Vannoy
Represented By: Wendell R. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.
Represented By: Wendell R. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Brown
Represented By: Melissa T. Richardson
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa D. Hatfield
Represented By: Melissa T. Richardson
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?