Johnson Controls, Inc. v. UD Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Defendant: UD Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00073
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent U.D. Contracting, Inc. for UD Contracting, Inc.. by UD Contracting, Inc.. (Blandford, David)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by UD Contracting, Inc.. (Blandford, David)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR U.D. CONTRACTING, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/30/2021 granting #6 Proposed Agreed Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that U.D. Contracting is granted an extension of time to and including 8/31/2021, to plead in response to the complaint of Plaintiff. cc: Counsel(EAS)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time for UD Contracting, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UD Contracting, Inc.. (Blandford, David)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/22/21: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UD Contracting, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Johnson Controls, Inc... (DJT)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UD Contracting, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3386377, filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Technical Operations and Services, #3 Exhibit Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Request for Proposal, #5 Exhibit Rider, #6 Exhibit Emails and Teaming Agreement) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Controls, Inc. v. UD Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: J. Tanner Watkins
Represented By: Young-Eun Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UD Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Blandford
Represented By: Matthew F. Coogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?