Griffith v. CSX Transportation Inc.
Plaintiff: Dustin R Griffith
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00017
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EBOC) on 3/14/2022: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/18/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2022 at 9:30 AM CDT in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.cc:counsel; CM-HBB (EAS)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 2/22/2022: IT IS ORDERED Attorney Charles J. Swartwout will be stricken as counsel of record for the Defendant and his name shall be removed from the service list until he has fully complied with Local Rule 83.2. cc:counsel; Attorney Charles J. Swartwout (EAS)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 2/18/2022: IT IS ORDERED Attorney Patrick Ryan Dunn Sullivan will be stricken as counsel of record for the Plaintiff and his name shall be removed from the service list until he has fully complied with Local Rule 83.2.cc:counsel; Patrick Ryan Dunn Sullivan (EAS)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 2/18/2022: IT IS ORDERED Attorney Emily C. O'Connor will be stricken as counsel of record for the Defendant and her name shall be removed from the service list until she has fully complied with Local Rule 83.2.cc:counsel; Attorney Emily C. O'Connor (EAS)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 2/18/2022: IT IS ORDERED Attorney Harlan A. Harla will be stricken as counsel of record for the Plaintiff and his name shall be removed from the service list until he has fully complied with Local Rule 83.2. cc:counsel; Harlan A. Harla (EAS)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 2/14/2022 granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John P. Kujawski, counsel for Dustin R. Griffith. cc: Counsel; John Kujawski w/ ECF ntc (EAS)
February 9, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for John P. Kujawski to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125 (Receipt #L330649439). by Plaintiff Dustin R Griffith (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Admission/Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (EAS)
February 2, 2022 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Payne, Rodney)
February 2, 2022 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Payne, Rodney)
January 31, 2022 Filing 28 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Charles J. Swartwout re #20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/17/2022. (KJA)
January 31, 2022 Filing 27 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John P. Kujawski re #20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/17/2022. (KJA)
January 31, 2022 Filing 26 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Emily C. O'Connor re #20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/14/2022. (KJA)
January 31, 2022 Filing 25 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Harlan A. Harla re #20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/14/2022. (KJA)
January 31, 2022 Filing 24 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Patrick Ryan Dunn Sullivan re #20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/14/2022. (KJA)
January 28, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney D. Payne on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Payne, Rodney)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/28/2022: This action is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel; CM-HBB (EAS)
January 27, 2022 Filing 21 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley Jr. (KJA)
January 27, 2022 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-01401. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Defendant CSX Transportation Inc.'s Motion to Transfer (Doc. #11 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the District Court for the Western District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/26/2022. (smo) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #17 Order. A corrected order will issue. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STRICKEN - ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Transfer (Doc. #11 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the District Court for the Western District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/26/2022. (smo) Modified on 1/26/2022 (smo). Modified on 1/26/2022 (kek). [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue filed by Dustin R Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Kujawski, John) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue. Responses due by 1/18/2022 (amv) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Doc. #14 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response is due January 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/20/2021. (smo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Dustin R Griffith. (Kujawski, John) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily C. O'Connor on behalf of CSX Transportation Inc. (O'Connor, Emily) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue filed by CSX Transportation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Peyton)(Swartwout, Charles) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by CSX Transportation Inc.. (Swartwout, Charles) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CSX Transportation Inc.. (Swartwout, Charles) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Swartwout on behalf of CSX Transportation Inc. (Swartwout, Charles) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-01401-SMY. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kujawski, John) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation Inc. Original mailed to requesting party. (clt) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Dustin R Griffith. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-01401-GCS. Consent due by 11/30/2021 (clt) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Ryan Dunn Sullivan on behalf of Dustin R Griffith (Sullivan, Patrick) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan A. Harla on behalf of Dustin R Griffith (Harla, Harlan) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Kujawski on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kujawski, John) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4629038.), filed by Dustin R Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kujawski, John) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/27/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. CSX Transportation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin R Griffith
Represented By: Harlan A. Harla
Represented By: Patrick Ryan Dunn Sullivan
Represented By: John P. Kujawski
Represented By: John Kujawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Charles J. Swartwout
Represented By: Emily C. O'Connor
Represented By: Rodney D. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?