Meyer v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: John David Meyer and Katherine Sterett
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Hyundai Translead, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00097
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
2 Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 ml Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle Prod Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/21/2022 granting (38) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:21-cv-00079-BJB-HBB; granting (11) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:22-cv-00097-BJB-HBB. All pleadings, memoranda and discovery filed in the dismissed case shall be incorporated by reference now as part of the lead case 4:21cv-00079-BJB. Case Number 4:22cv-00097-BJB is administratively DISMISSED. cc: Counsel(JM)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/21/2022 granting #14 Motion for Attorney Alina Mooradian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 20, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Alina Mooradian to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3662777. by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Keal, R.)
September 13, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Hyundai Translead, Inc. (Poltorak, Andrew) Modified docket text on 9/13/2022 (DeW).
August 31, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Brennenstuhl for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Brennenstuhl may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, HBB-CM (SMJ)
August 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs John David Meyer, Katherine Sterett (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Hay, Richard)
August 23, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hyundai Translead, Inc.. (Tate, John)
August 16, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Andrew J. Poltorak re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: admission to this Court or motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/2/2022. (KJA)
August 12, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Amended Complaint) by Ford Motor Company. (Keal, R.)
August 11, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Translead, Inc.. (Tate, John) Modified on 8/12/2022 to add Hyundai Motor Co. as a corporate parent (DeW).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.: IT IS ORDERED that Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. RECUSES from this case. Pursuant to General Order 22-06, this action is REASSIGNED to the docket of Judge Benjamin Beaton for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel; CM-BB (EAS)
August 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/17/2022. (SRH)
August 10, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Ohio Circuit Court (SRH)
August 9, 2022 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley Jr.. (SRH)
August 8, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (SRH)
August 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Ohio Circuit Court, case number 22- CI-00189. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3632450). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 continued - Summons and Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Annual Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Consent to Removal, #5 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Meyer
Represented By: John David Meyer
Represented By: Richard Hay
Represented By: Sarah Hay Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Sterett
Represented By: Richard Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: R. Thad Keal
Represented By: Alina Mooradian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Translead, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Poltorak
Represented By: Brian Butler
Represented By: John Lewis Tate
Represented By: Andrew Poltorak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?