Lauderdale v. Brady et al
Plaintiff: Lamone Lauderdale
Defendant: Amy Brady, Colonel Hendricks, Quality Correctional Care, Weber, Jane/John Doe and Dr. Troost
Case Number: 4:2022cv00117
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Amy Brady, Hendricks. (Hopgood, J.)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/7/2022 granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglass R. Bitner, counsel for Quality Correctional Care. cc: Counsel; Douglass Bitner w/ ECF mandatory ntc.(EAS)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Quality Correctional Care, Troost, Weber. (Langerak, Joseph)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Douglass R. Bitner to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3673329. by Defendant Quality Correctional Care (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Indiana Certificate of Good Standing) (Langerak, Joseph)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Langerak, IV on behalf of Quality Correctional Care, Troost, Weber (Langerak, Joseph)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lamone Lauderdale. Weber served on 9/16/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (EAS)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to satisfy the record and ask the Courts for assistance by Plaintiff Lamone Lauderdale (EAS)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lamone Lauderdale. Quality Correctional Care served on 9/14/2022, answer due 10/5/2022. (EAS)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lamone Lauderdale as to Amy Brady. (JM)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lamone Lauderdale. Troost served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (JM)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lamone Lauderdale. Hendricks served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (JM)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 POSTAL RETURN RECEIPT for certified mail delivered to the Henderson County Attorney's Office (re DN #1 , #6 and #7 ) (JM)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF CERTIFIED MAILING, return receipt requested, to the Henderson County Attorney per #6 Order. (EAS)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Amy Brady, Hendricks, Quality Correctional Care, Troost, Weber. Service packets being e-mailed to US Marshal Service as instructed. (Attachments: #1 USM 285s) (EAS)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL REVIEW AND SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 9/2/2022: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any John or Jane Doe parties are dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Dr. Troost as a Defendant and to terminate "Any/All Jane/John Doe, et al" as Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall issue summonses for Defendants Brady, Hendricks, Weber and Troost, and the US Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, this order and summonses on these Defendants. A copy of these documents shall also be sent via certified mail to the Henderson County Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and issue a summons for Defendant QCC and the US Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, this Order, and summons on the registered agent of Defendant QCC: CT Corporation System, 306 W. Main Street, Suite 512, Frankfort, KY 40601. All Pretrial Discovery due by 12/28/2022. Plaintiff's Pre-trial Memorandum due by 1/27/2023. Defendants' Pre-trial Memorandum due by 2/27/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2023. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Prisoner Handbook. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants (as directed); Henderson County Attorney (as directed above) (EAS)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EBOC) on 8/30/2022 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. IT IS ORDERED the Henderson County Detention Center shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $29.04 and thereafter the balance of $320.96 (*see Order for specific content and instructions). The Clerk of Court is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Financial Section USDC WDKY; HCDC, Attn: Inmate Accounts(EAS)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lamone Lauderdale by Lamone Lauderdale. (DJT)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lamone Lauderdale (DJT)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amy Brady, Jane/John Doe, Hendricks, Quality Correctional Care, Weber, filed by Lamone Lauderdale. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauderdale v. Brady et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamone Lauderdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Brady
Represented By: Davis Lee Hunter
Represented By: J. Christopher Hopgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Hendricks
Represented By: Davis Lee Hunter
Represented By: J. Christopher Hopgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Correctional Care
Represented By: Douglass Bitner
Represented By: Joseph H. Langerak, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber
Represented By: Joseph H. Langerak, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Troost
Represented By: Joseph H. Langerak, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?