Wade et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Scott Wade and Jennifer Wade
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Not Classified By Court: Warning Order Attorney
3Rd Party Defendant: Suzanne M. Langley and Unknown Driver
Case Number: 4:2023cv00008
Filed: January 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
2 Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Filing 41 ANSWER to #28 Third Party Complaint by Suzanne M. Langley. (Towe, Adam)
October 16, 2023 Filing 40 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Suzanne M. Langley COMPLETED on 10/16/2023. Secretary of State return states Suzanne M. Langley Served. (DJT)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/11/2023 granting #34 Motion for Attorney Fees. Warning Order Attorney, Hon. Travis L. Holtrey, is relieved of any further service in this proceeding and is granted a legal fee and reimbursement of his expenses totaling $367.25. cc: Counsel (SRH)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/22/2023 granting #36 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery now due by 1/15/2024. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) now due by 2/15/2024. Expert Witness (Defendant) now due by 4/15/2024. All other provisions of the Court's Scheduling Order DN #22 shall remain in full force and effect. cc: Counsel (SRH)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/22/2023 granting #35 Proposed Agreed Order. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
September 20, 2023 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Third Party Plaintiffs Ford Motor Company, Ford Motor Company, Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keal, R.)
September 20, 2023 Filing 35 Proposed Agreed Order (Stipulated Protective Order) by Ford Motor Company. (Keal, R.)
September 12, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Miscellaneous Warning Order Attorney (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Holtrey, Travis)
September 12, 2023 Filing 33 WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY REPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) by Warning Order Attorney. (Holtrey, Travis) Modified to correct filer on 9/29/2023 (TJD).
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/7/2023 granting #26 Warning Order. Attorney Travis L. Holtrey is appointed as Warning Order Attorney for the Unknown Third Party Defendant. cc: Counsel(JWM)
August 9, 2023 Filing 31 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Unknown Driver, filed by Ford Motor Company. (JWM)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/7/2023 granting #25 Motion for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint. The tendered Third-Party Complaint is ordered filed. cc: Counsel(JWM)
August 9, 2023 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Suzanne M. Langley. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
August 9, 2023 Filing 28 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Suzanne M. Langley, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Tendered)) (JWM)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/7/2023 granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. The tendered Third-Party Complaint is ordered filed and summonses issued accordingly. cc: Counsel(JWM)
July 7, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Keal, R.)
July 7, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint Against Unknown Defendant by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support, #4 Exhibit 3 to Memo in Support (Douglas v. Rueff), #5 Exhibit Third-Party Complaint, #6 Proposed Order) (Keal, R.)
July 7, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support, #4 Exhibit Third-Party Complaint (Langley), #5 Summons Langley Summons, #6 Proposed Order) (Keal, R.)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to GO 23-06, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel; CM-GNS (EAS)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/17/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 3/28/2023. Plaintiff Joinder of Parties/Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2023. Defendant Joinder of Parties/Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2023. Pretrial Fact Discovery due by 11/1/2023. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 12/15/2023. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 3/4/2024. Expert Discovery depositions due by 6/3/2024. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/10/2024 at 9:30 AM CDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 7/3/2024. cc:counsel (EAS)
March 23, 2023 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Daubert Motion due by 7/3/2024 #22 . (EAS)
March 9, 2023 Filing 21 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joe Harrison Wade, II re #18 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/27/2023. (KJA)
February 28, 2023 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ford Motor Company. (Keal, R.)
February 27, 2023 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #12 sent to Joe Harrison Wade (EAS)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 2/23/2023 granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joe Harrison Wade, II, counsel for Plaintiffs. cc: Counsel; Joe Wade, II w/ ECF Mand. Ntc.(EAS)
February 22, 2023 Filing 17 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Jennifer Wade, Scott Wade. (Conley, Shea)
February 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE Proposed Order by Jennifer Wade, Scott Wade re #14 MOTION for Joe Harrison Wade, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3755754. (Conley, Shea)
February 22, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency re #13 Notice of Appearance.Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1(a)(2) disclosure statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/1/2023. (EAS)
February 22, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Joe Harrison Wade, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3755754. by Plaintiffs Jennifer Wade, Scott Wade (Conley, Shea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (EAS).
February 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shea W. Conley on behalf of Jennifer Wade, Scott Wade (Conley, Shea)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 2/9/2023 granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael R. Boorman, counsel for Ford Motor Company. cc: Counsel; Michael R. Boorman w/ ECF Mandatory Notice via US Mail(EAS)
February 8, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Michael R. Boorman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ford Motor Company Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3747854. by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keal, R.)
February 3, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joe Harrison Wade re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/21/2023. (KJA)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EBOC) on 1/24/2023: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2023. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2023 at 10:00 AM CDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.cc:counsel; Joe Harrison Wade (via US Mail); CM-HBB (EAS)
January 23, 2023 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Keal, R.)
January 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or non-jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a Magistrate Judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the #Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at # intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov. c: Joe Wade (EAS)
January 18, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Muhlenberg Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 1/18/23: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
January 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1(a)(2) disclosure statement not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/25/2023. (DJT)
January 18, 2023 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
January 18, 2023 ANSWER with Jury Demand filed in State Court Record (See #1 -3 for full viewing) by Ford Motor Company. (DJT)
January 17, 2023 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (DJT)
January 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Ford Motor Company from Muhlenberg Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-00425. Filing fee $ 402; receipt number AKYWDC-3731879, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Addendum, #3 Exhibit 1: State Court Record (Summons, Complaint and Answer), #4 Exhibit 2: Annual Report) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Wade
Represented By: Joe Harrison Wade
Represented By: Joe Harrison Wade, II
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wade
Represented By: Joe Harrison Wade
Represented By: Joe Harrison Wade, II
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: R. Thad Keal
Represented By: Michael R. Boorman
Represented By: Michael Roger Boorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Travis L. Holtrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Suzanne M. Langley
Represented By: Adam L. Towe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Unknown Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?