Martin v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Audry Martin
Defendant: James A. Lewis, Best Services Group, Inc. and H&W Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv00030
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 mv Removal- Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 5/3/2024 granting #10 Motion for Rick A. Cory to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/29/2024. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 5/22/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2024. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 10/4/2024. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 12/2/2024. Fact Discovery due by 10/4/2024. Expert Discovery due by 3/17/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 11/5/2024. Daubert Motions due by 12/31/2024. Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2024. cc: Counsel (DLW)
April 17, 2024 Filing 11 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice re #10 MOTION for Rick A. Cory to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number AKYWDC-4015186) by Audry Martin. (Cory, Rick)
April 17, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Rick A. Cory to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number AKYWDC-4015186) by Plaintiff Audry Martin (Cory, Rick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2024: #1 Proposed Order) (DLW).
April 16, 2024 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Best Services Group, Inc., H&W Holdings, LLC, James A. Lewis. (Noblett, Kaleb)
April 15, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Joint Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Report by Best Services Group, Inc., H&W Holdings, LLC, James A. Lewis (Noblett, Kaleb) Modified on 4/16/2024 - text added (SMJ).
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 3/13/2024: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2024 at 9:30 AM CDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc: Counsel (DLW)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/12/2024; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Hopkins Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Best Services Group, Inc. for H&W Holdings, LLC.. (DJT)
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent BSG Holdings, Inc. for Best Services Group, Inc.. (DJT)
March 11, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by H&W Holdings, LLC, Best Services Group, Inc., James A. Lewis from Hopkins Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00727. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AKYWDC-3993063, filed by H&W Holdings, LLC, Best Services Group, Inc., James A. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings) (DJT)
March 11, 2024 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Filed in State Court see DN #1 -2 for full viewing) by Best Services Group, Inc., H&W Holdings, LLC, James A. Lewis. (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audry Martin
Represented By: Chad E. Groves
Represented By: Rick A. Cory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Lewis
Represented By: Kaleb Jordan Noblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kaleb Jordan Noblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&W Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kaleb Jordan Noblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?