Ashby v. Burgess
Plaintiff: Timothy W. Ashby
Defendant: Meredith G. Burgess
Case Number: 4:2024cv00051
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 mv Removal- Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2024 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Meredith G. Burgess. (Jones, Edwin)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 6/11/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 7/29/2024 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/11/2024; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a magistrate judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (https://www.kywd.uscourts.gov/sites/kywd/files/forms/ao085-1-Notice-Consent.pdf) and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-HBB. (ARM)
June 7, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #8 Amended Document, Affidavit of Meredith Burgess to Amended Petition by Meredith G. Burgess by Meredith G. Burgess. (Jones, Edwin)
June 7, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Meredith G. Burgess. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Petition for Removal (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A state court pleadings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B answer to complaint, #4 Affidavit Exhibit C Affidavit of Burgess w-ID, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Authority) by Meredith G. Burgess. (Jones, Edwin)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/5/2024: Defendant shall make a suitable curative filing within five (5) days from the date of entry of this order. If the Court determines that it does not have subject matter jurisdiction this action shall be dismissed without prejudice. cc: Counsel (DLW)
May 20, 2024 Filing 6 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Meredith G. Burgess. (Jones, Edwin)
May 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Petition for Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Missing Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/24/2024. (KDY)
May 17, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Ohio Circuit Court and counsel of record/parties re #1 Petition for Removal. (KDY)
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (KDY)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF AUTHORITY TO CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Meredith G. Burgess. (KDY)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL filed by Meredith G. Burgess from Ohio Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-00066. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4034756) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B Answer to Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet) (KDY)
May 16, 2024 ANSWER with Jury Demand (filed in Ohio Circuit Court - See DN #1 -2 by Meredith G. Burgess. (KDY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashby v. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith G. Burgess
Represented By: Edwin A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W. Ashby
Represented By: Gregory E. H. Smith
Represented By: Daryl T. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?