Anderson, et al v. Old National Bancorp

Case Number: 5:2002cv00324
Filed: November 18, 2002
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Stockholders Suits Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part 105 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/26/08. cc:counsel (KJS)
March 25, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/24/09; re 120 SEALED MOTION filed by Old National Bancorp, Old National Trust Company ; an appropriate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJS)
July 29, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 161 Motion to Alter Judgment; case shall be reopened; vacating 165 Motion for Joinder; vacating 120 defendants' cross motion for; Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2009. Telephone Conference set for 12/1/2009 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell.. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 07/29/2009. cc:counsel (CSD)
December 10, 2009 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 170 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 172 Motion for Hearing; denying 173 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/9/09. cc:counsel (KJS)
June 30, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER denying 138 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/30/2010. cc:counsel (KJA)
August 6, 2010 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 192 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/6/2010. cc:counsel (KJA)
December 29, 2010 214 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 204 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 206 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/28/2010. cc:counsel (KJA)
September 28, 2011 231 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 217 Motion to Compel Telephone Conference set for 10/14/2011 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/27/2011. cc:counsel (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson, et al v. Old National Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.