Thies et al v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thies and Gloria Thies
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2009cv00098
Filed: June 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Paducah Office
County: Lyon
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 89 Motion to Reopen Case; dismissing as moot 90 Motion to Refer. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 2/15/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 83 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/4/2012. cc:counsel (KJA)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 08/16/2011 re 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew Thies, Elizabeth Thies; appropriate order to issue. cc:counsel (CSD)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 2/3/2011. cc:counsel (KJA)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Telephone Conference set for 9/22/2010 at 8:30 AM before Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/13/2010. cc:counsel (KJA)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 11/24/09: regarding Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Order 15 ; Discovery due by 2/1/2010. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/10/2010 at 8:30 AM before Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell.cc:counsel (KJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thies et al v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thies
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Thies
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?