Thompson v. Parker

Petitioner: William Eugene Thompson
Respondent: Phillip W. Parker
Case Number: 5:2011cv00031
Filed: March 1, 2011
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Paducah Office
County: Lyon
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/22/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)
December 10, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/10/2012; an appropriate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJA)
May 2, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 23 Motion for Hearing; Evidentiary Hearing set 6/14/2012 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/1/2012. cc:counsel (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Eugene Thompson
Represented By: David H. Harshaw, III
Represented By: Dennis J. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phillip W. Parker
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?