Griffin v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: David Griffin
Defendant: Charles A. Jones, Sarah C. Jones, CA Jones Management Group, LLC, Global Book Resellers, LLC and John Doe Entities (1-10)
Case Number: 5:2012cv00163
Filed: November 2, 2012
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Paducah Office
County: Calloway
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2016 183 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER withdrawing 137 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/21/2016. cc: Counsel(KJA)
September 29, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/29/2014; re 63 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Commonwealth Economics, LLC, John Farris, 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Re Civil RICO Counterclaim of C. Jones), filed by David Griffin, 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joe Pat Cohoon, 56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Wittman ; an appropriate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJA)
September 27, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/27/2013 re 21 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Charles A. Jones, CA Jones Management Group, LLC, Global Book Resellers, LLC, and Technology Associates, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to the above claims. cc: Counsel (CDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Griffin
Represented By: William L. Campbell
Represented By: Joseph Allen Kelly
Represented By: Charles M. Pritchett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A. Jones
Represented By: John B. Enkema
Represented By: Benjamin E. Goldammer
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah C. Jones
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Jones Management Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Book Resellers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entities (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?