Burkhead & Scott, Inc v. City of Hopkinsville, Kentucky

Plaintiff: Burkhead & Scott, Inc
Defendant: City of Hopkinsville, Kentucky and Hopkinsville Solid Waste Authority
Case Number: 5:2012cv00198
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Paducah Office
County: Christian
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers. For the foregoing reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Alter, Amend, or Vacate the Court's Previous Judgment (DN 51 ) is DENIED and Defendants' Bill of Costs (DN 49 ) is GRANTED. cc: Counsel (CDR)
January 27, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/26/2016. cc: Counsel(KJA)
December 19, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/19/2014. cc: Counsel(KJA)
December 1, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/1/2014; re 24 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged Emails filed by City of Hopkinsville, Kentucky ; see order for specificscc:counsel (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burkhead & Scott, Inc v. City of Hopkinsville, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burkhead & Scott, Inc
Represented By: David F. Broderick
Represented By: Dennis J. Conniff
Represented By: Emily C. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hopkinsville, Kentucky
Represented By: C. Thomas Miller
Represented By: James A. Sigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopkinsville Solid Waste Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?