Luther v. White et al
Plaintiff: Dion L. Luther
Defendant: Randy White, Skyla Grief, Dan Smith, Terry Peede, Gage Rodriguez and Jesse Coombs
Case Number: 5:2017cv00138
Filed: September 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Paducah Office
County: Lyon
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/4/2019. Granting 120 Fourth MOTION for Summary Judgment . A separate judgment shall enter.cc:counsel, plaintiff pro se (KJA)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/21/2019. Granting 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Skyla Grief is terminated from this action. cc: Counsel, plaintiff pro se(KJA) (Main Document 110 replaced on 5/22/2019) (KJA).
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/6/2019 granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 22 Motion for Leave to Amen d Complaint. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate the Following Defendants: Terry Peede, Chris Kleymeyer, Randy White and Dan Smith. Telephone Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 2:00 PM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. cc: Counsel, Plaintiff (pro se) (JM)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/6/2018: Plaintiff's motion 16 to supplement with regard to First Amendment and RLUIPA claims against Dan Smith, Chris Kleymeyer, and Skyla Grief is GRANTED; Plain tiff's motion 16 to supplement with regard to Erwin and claims related to equal protection and failure to protect is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to add Chris Kleymeyer and Skyla Grief as Defendants in this case. Defendant Smith sha ll file his answer within 21 days of entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Defendants' motion 20 for summary judgment is DISMISSED without prejudice to filing a motion for summary judgment at the appropriate time. cc: Counsel, Plaintiff (pro se) (JM)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/19/2017. The Court will enter a separate Order Regarding Service and Scheduling Order to govern the development of the remaining claims.cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants; General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet, Office of Legal Counsel (MNM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luther v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion L. Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyla Grief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Peede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gage Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?