Z.H. v. Kentucky High School Athletic Association

Plaintiff: Z.H.
Defendant: Kentucky High School Athletic Association
Case Number: 5:2018cv00190
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Telephone Conference held on 2/4/2019. Telephone Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 10:45 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. cc:counsel (KJA)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/25/2019. Based on the reasons above, and the Court being otherwise sufficiently advised, Z's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (R. 5), remains DENIED. Telephone Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 10:30 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell.cc:counsel (KJA)
January 24, 2019 Filing 29 BRIEF in Response to Plaintiff's Brief re #25 Telephone Conference, #26 Brief filed by Z.H. by Kentucky High School Athletic Association. (Ams, Jason)
January 22, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Filing Official Transcript re #27 Transcript - Court Official. Please review the complete Notice for instructions. (TT)
January 22, 2019 Filing 27 FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 1/3/2019, before Judge Thomas B. Russell. Court Reporter Terri Turner, Telephone number 270-415-6417. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2019. (TT)
January 21, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEF in Accordance with Court Order of January 18, 2019 by Z.H.. (Adams, William)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Telephone Conference held on 1/17/2019. Brief due by 1/23/2019. Response due by 1/25/2019. See order for specifics. cc:counsel (KJA)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Telephone Conference held on 1/15/2019. Telephone Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. cc:counsel (KJA)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Transcript Request by Kentucky High School Athletic Association (Ams, Jason)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/11/2019 denying #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. A telephonic conference is set for 1/15/2019 at 10:45 am CST. The Court will initiate the call. cc: Counsel(JWM)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Evidentiary Hearing held on 1/3/2019. The matter stands submitted to the Court. (Court Reporter Terri Turner.) cc:counsel (KJA)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/2/2019. Granting #14 Motion to Seal Document #15 Sealed Document. cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 Receipt of Non-Electronic Document (FILED UNDER SEAL) by Kentucky High School Athletic Association re #16 Notice #15 Sealed Document (1 DVD received) (KJA)
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 Receipt of Non-Electronic Document by Z.H. re #12 Notice. (MNM)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 Witness List and Exhibit List by Kentucky High School Athletic Association. (Ams, Jason)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Conventional Filing by Kentucky High School Athletic Association re #15 Sealed Document (Collins, Chad)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 Sealed Document re #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Collins, Chad) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/28/2018) (MLG).
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document by Defendant Kentucky High School Athletic Association (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Collins, Chad)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 Exhibit List and Witness List by Z.H... (Adams, William)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing - Hearing Tape by Z.H. (Adams, William)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Z.H.. (Adams, William)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/27/2018. Both Parties shall file with the Court a list of any exhibits and a list of any witnesses they plan on using or calling at the January 3, 2019 hearing. Objections, if any, to the proposed witnesses and exhibits will be heard and ruled on by the Court at the hearing.cc: Counsel of Record (MNM)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kentucky High School Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KHSAA Due Process Procedure, #2 Exhibit Bylaw 6, #3 Exhibit Final Order, #4 Exhibit Transfer Form, #5 Exhibit Initial Ruling, #6 Exhibit Appeal letter, #7 Exhibit Recommended Order, #8 Exhibit Unpublished case, #9 Exhibit Paducah Sun article) (Ams, Jason)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for proceedings held before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell: Telephone Conference held on 12/17/2018. Evidentiary Hearing re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 1/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in Paducah Courtroom before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. Responses due by 12/21/2018. Replies due by 12/28/2018. cc:counsel (KJA)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Ams on behalf of Kentucky High School Athletic Association (Ams, Jason)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/17/2018. A Telephonic Conference is set for 12/17/2018 at 3:30 PM Central before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. The Court will place the call to counsel. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (KPH)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Z.H. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Bond) (Adams, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Marshall Circuit Court (MNM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Kentucky High School Athletic Association. (MNM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kentucky High School Athletic Association from Marshall Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00436 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2768531). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing, #4 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Z.H. v. Kentucky High School Athletic Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.H.
Represented By: William C. Adams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky High School Athletic Association
Represented By: Chad W. Collins
Represented By: Jason T. Ams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?