The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Tennessee-Kentucky Automatic Sprinkler Company et al
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: John Does 1-5, Tennessee-Kentucky Automatic Sprinkler Company and ABC Corporations 1-5
Case Number: 5:2019cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tennessee-Kentucky Automatic Sprinkler Company. (Casey, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Tennessee-Kentucky Automatic Sprinkler Company. (Casey, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Tennessee-Kentucky Automatic Sprinkler Company COMPLETED on 2/4/2019. Secretary of State return states 1/18/2019. (KJA)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Office of Secretary of State. (MNM)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tennessee-Kentucky Automatic Sprinkler Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Attested copy of Complaint emailed to counsel. (MNM)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5, and Tennessee-Kentucky Automatic Sprinkler Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2778138, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Tennessee-Kentucky Automatic Sprinkler Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee-Kentucky Automatic Sprinkler Company
Represented By: Michael P. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: David B. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?