Barrett et al v. USA Service Finance, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC and Cathrine Barrett
Defendant: USA Service Finance, LLC, Graceland Properties, LLC, Christopher E Burnett, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, Daniel T Burnett and CEB Investments, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00036
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Paducah Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 67 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Christina H. Banfield re #59 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/19/2019. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 66 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Charles E. Simpson, Jr. re #59 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/19/2019. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 65 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Scott D. Wyatt re #59 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/19/2019. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 64 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Donavan John Hylarides re #59 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/19/2019. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 63 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Joshua A. Yost re #59 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/19/2019. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 62 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Craig D. Schauer re #59 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/19/2019. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 61 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Daniel D. Adams re #59 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/19/2019. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 60 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 59 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00155. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 58 JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/5/2019. (Tripp, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying as moot #24 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Joint Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #26 Joint Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Joint Motion to Transfer Case to the Western District of Kentucky; denying without prejudice #51 Motion to Quash; denying without prejudice #54 Second Motion to Quash; and, denying without prejudice #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/5/2019. (Tripp, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #54 Second MOTION to Quash. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #54 Second MOTION to Quash or Modify, and for a Protective Order filed by Cathrine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Schauer, Craig) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 55 Memorandum in Support regarding #54 Second MOTION to Quash filed by Graceland Properties, LLC. (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 54 Second MOTION to Quash filed by Graceland Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to John Carr, #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena to Jonathan Kennemore, #3 Exhibit C - Subpoena to Clayton, Byrd, & Meeks LLP, #4 Exhibit D - Subpoena to Citizens Deposit Bank of Arlington, Inc., #5 Exhibit E - Correspondence between Plaintiffs' Counsel and Counsel for Graceland Properties, LLC) (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #51 MOTION to Quash. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #51 MOTION to Quash filed by Cathrine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Schauer, Craig) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 52 Memorandum in Support regarding #51 MOTION to Quash filed by Graceland Properties, LLC. (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Quash filed by Graceland Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to John H. Stevens, #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena to IberiaBank, #3 Exhibit C - Subpoena to Wesbanco Bank, Inc., #4 Exhibit D - Subpoena to Robert S. Wainwright) (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/25/2019. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order) (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Appointing Mediator J. Anderson Little. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/23/2019. (Horton, B.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 47 Selection of J. Anderson Little as mediator filed by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Remark - #46 SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Tripp, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 46 SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternativeJoint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Kentucky Sur-Reply filed by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email (December 9 2016), #2 B - Email (December 13 2016)) (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file the proposed sur-reply within five (5) days of the entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/2/2019. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
January 2, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 1/23/2019. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 7/19/19. Mediation Deadline set for 7/19/19. Motions due by 8/19/19. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/2/19. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #41 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 42 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #24 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternativeJoint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Kentucky. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternativeJoint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Kentucky filed by Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Declaration of Daniel Burnett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Second Declaration of Christopher Burnett) (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #24 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Declaration of Daniel Burnett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Second Declaration of Christopher Burnett) (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 12/13/18. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/8/18. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles E. Simpson, Jr on behalf of Graceland Properties, LLC. (Simpson, Charles) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #36 Reply to Response to Motion. Charles E. Simpson, Jr. should file a Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Graceland Properties, LLC. (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Order regarding Text Order,,, filed by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply regarding #24 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Kentucky. Replies due by 11/16/2018. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/1/2018. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Response in Opposition to Motion, #32 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hylarides, Donavan) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternativeJoint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Kentucky filed by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WDKY Response to Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit B - WDKY Response to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - WDKY Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D - WDKY Motion to Transfer, #5 Exhibit E - WDKY Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint) (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #24 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 30 Declaration of Cathrine Barrett by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Paystubs, #2 Exhibit B - Emails) (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Where defendants have filed motions to dismiss, good cause appears to delay the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan, where ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger these activities in preface to its entry of a case management order through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Unless a party raises objection to a stay of these activities pending completion of briefing on the motions now at issue, and decision thereon by this court, in filing due within 14 days from date of entry of this order, the court will stay that aspect of the case so as to promote focus on the issues raised in defendants' motions. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/22/2018. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Heartland Capital Investments, LLC. (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support regarding #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternativeJoint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Kentucky filed by Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USA Serv v. Barrett et al 5:18-cv-110 (W.D.Ky.), #2 Exhibit 2 - Federal District Court Statistics) (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Kentucky filed by Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher E. Burnett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Daniel T. Burnett) (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support regarding #24 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USA Serv v. Barrett et al 5:18-cv-110 (W.D.Ky.)) (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 24 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher E. Burnett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Daniel T. Burnett) (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Donavan John Hylarides on behalf of Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Hylarides, Donavan) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Freddy Jreisat (Schauer, Craig) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Catherine Barrett (Schauer, Craig) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Valor Capital Holdings, LLC (Schauer, Craig) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 19, 2018 TEXT ORDER. The Court has been informed that due to the impacts of Hurricane Florence, counsel for defendant Graceland Properties LLC is unable to serve counsel for plaintiffs with the Motion to Dismiss #15 and Memorandum in Support #16 , as previously directed by the Court. The clerk is DIRECTED to electronically serve counsel for plaintiffs with a copy of the motion and memorandum. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including October 19, 2018, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. Entered by US District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/19/2018. (Stouch, L.) Modified on 9/19/2018 to correct date in docket entry text (Stouch, L.). [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua Aaron Yost on behalf of Catherine Barrett, Freddy Jreisat, Valor Capital Holdings, LLC. (Yost, Joshua) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Craig Daniel Schauer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Schauer, Craig) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel DeCederfelt Adams on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Adams, Daniel) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 12, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Counsel has failed to indicate on the Certificate of Service that a copy of this document was sent via US mail to counsel for plaintiff. Counsel for Plaintiff has not filed their Notices of Appearance and therefore cannot receive filings by CM/ECF until they do so. Counsel shall file an amended Certificate of Service indicating that the above has been done. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Graceland Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Case - McLeskey v. Davis Boat Works, Inc., #2 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Rauch Indus. v. Radko, #3 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Reeger Builders, Inc. v. J.C. Demo Ins. Group, Inc.) (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Graceland Properties, LLC. (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 Notice filed by Graceland Properties, LLC regarding #10 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: #10 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to Section V(E) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, attachments and exhibits must be identified with a clear and complete description in the docket entry text. The clerk's office has corrected the deficiency in this instance, but future filings must adhere to the court's filing policy. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/10/2018. (Certified copy served via U.S. Mail upon plaintiffs' counsel, Daniel Adams and Craig D. Schauer, Brooks, Pierce, McLendon Humphrey & Leonard, LLP, PO Box 1800, Raleigh, NC 27602) (Tripp, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer complaint. (Tripp, S.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer complaint filed by Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure. *Financial Disclosure Statements were previously filed for Defendants' Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott F. Wyatt on behalf of Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Graceland Properties, LLC from Craven County Superior Court, case number 18-CVS-01069. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4648521) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings #2 Exhibit B Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk) (Banfield, Christina) Modified on 9/11/2018 to identify exhibits. (Collins, S.). [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Graceland Properties, LLC (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Christina J. Banfield on behalf of Graceland Properties, LLC. (Banfield, Christina) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiffs' counsel Daniel Adams and Craig D. Schauer of Brooks, Pierce, McLendon Humphrey & Leonard, LLP, P.O. Box 1800, Raleigh, NC 27602 and to Defendant's counsel Charles E. Simpson, Jr. of Harris, Creech, Ward, and Blackerby, P.A., at 325 Pollock Street,New Bern, NC 28563 mailed via US Mail on September 7, 2018. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Christopher E Burnett, Daniel T Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by USA Service Finance, LLC (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Heartland Capital Investments, LLC (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daniel T Burnett (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Christopher E Burnett (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by CEB Investments, LLC (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Christopher E Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC from Craven County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 01069. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4648185), filed by Christopher E Burnett, CEB Investments, LLC, USA Service Finance, LLC, Heartland Capital Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wyatt, Scott) [Transferred from nced on 3/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett et al v. USA Service Finance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Service Finance, LLC
Represented By: Scott F. Wyatt
Represented By: Donavan John Hylarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graceland Properties, LLC
Represented By: Christina J. Banfield
Represented By: Charles E. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher E Burnett
Represented By: Scott F. Wyatt
Represented By: Donavan John Hylarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Capital Investments, LLC
Represented By: Scott F. Wyatt
Represented By: Donavan John Hylarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel T Burnett
Represented By: Scott F. Wyatt
Represented By: Donavan John Hylarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEB Investments, LLC
Represented By: Scott F. Wyatt
Represented By: Donavan John Hylarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Jreisat
Represented By: Craig D. Schauer
Represented By: Daniel D. Adams
Represented By: Joshua A. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valor Capital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Craig D. Schauer
Represented By: Daniel D. Adams
Represented By: Joshua A. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathrine Barrett
Represented By: Craig D. Schauer
Represented By: Daniel D. Adams
Represented By: Joshua A. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?