Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company v. Preferred Safety, LLC
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Preferred Safety, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: White & Associates Insurance Agency, Inc., White & Associates Insurance Wimberley Agency, LLC and Jon Dyer
Case Number: 5:2019cv00048
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 Third Party Summons Issued as to Jon Dyer, White & Associates Insurance Agency, Inc., White & Associates Insurance Wimberley Agency, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (KJA)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Jon Dyer, White & Associates Insurance Wimberley Agency, LLC, White and Associates Insurance Agency, Inc., filed by Preferred Safety, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to White and Associates Insurance Agency, #2 Summons Summons to White & Associates Wimberley - Tim Ladd, #3 Summons Summons to White & Associates Wimberley SOS, #4 Summons Summons to Jon Dyer, #5 Summons Summons to Jon Dyer SOS) (Fehrenbacher, Tony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company by Preferred Safety, LLC. (Fehrenbacher, Tony) Modified on 6/21/2019 to edit docket text to take out third party complaint (KJA).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/21/2019 granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel(KPH)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Manion on behalf of Preferred Safety, LLC (Manion, Andrew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Preferred Safety, LLC. (Fehrenbacher, Tony)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Preferred Safety, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fehrenbacher, Tony)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony W. Fehrenbacher on behalf of Preferred Safety, LLC (Fehrenbacher, Tony)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. Preferred Safety, LLC served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Green Card) (Uhl, Judd)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to Preferred Safety, LLC. (Uhl, Judd)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/30/2019. granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey A Goldwater. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Jeffrey A Goldwater to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2855136. by Plaintiff Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Uhl, Judd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Preferred Safety, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (KJA)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE for Clerk to Issue New Summons to Preferred Safety by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons) (Uhl, Judd)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/17/2019. Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Darcy Ibach. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel(KJA)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Darcy Ibach to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2846949. by Plaintiff Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Order) (Uhl, Judd)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency Darcy L. Ibach re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/3/2019. (KJA)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency for Jeffrey A. Goldwater re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/3/2019. (KJA)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Company for Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Uhl, Judd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Preferred Safety, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Preferred Safety, LLC, filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2843889, filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Reservation of Rights, #3 Exhibit C - 2017 BOP Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Umbrella Policy, #5 Exhibit E - MPL Endorsement, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company v. Preferred Safety, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig M. Schneider
Represented By: Darcy L. Ibach
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Goldwater
Represented By: Judd R. Uhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Preferred Safety, LLC
Represented By: Tony W. Fehrenbacher
Represented By: Andrew J. Manion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: White & Associates Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: White & Associates Insurance Wimberley Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jon Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?