Robinson v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Robinson
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00049
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Kenneth Robinson. (Edwards, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of service by Kenneth Robinson (Edwards, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Notice to Hold bad faith claim in abeyance filed by Kenneth Robinson. (Edwards, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery, #2 Proposed Order granting Motion to Stay Discovery) (Johnson, Christopher)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Johnson, Christopher)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Notice to Hold bad faith claim in abeyance filed by Kenneth Robinson. (Edwards, John)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Ewen, A.)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Notice to Hold bad faith claim in abeyance by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Ewen, A.)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Ewen, A.)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/17/2019. Granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Randall J. Fishman. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(KJA)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Randall J. Fishman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2847142. by Plaintiff Kenneth Robinson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Randall J. Fishman, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Edwards, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Johnson, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Fulton Circuit Court (MNM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (MNM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., and Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Fulton Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00013 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2844528). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Represented By: Christopher G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Represented By: Christopher G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Campbell Ewen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Represented By: Christopher G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Robinson
Represented By: Tim Edwards
Represented By: Randall J. Fishman
Represented By: John T. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?