Truskey v. Purdue et al

Plaintiff: Brian A. Truskey
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen and Sonny Purdue
Case Number: 5:2019cv00051
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Vicki Christiansen and Sonny Purdue. Forwarded to USM-Louisville as directed for service. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form) (MNM)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/24/2019. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons and the US Marshal shall serve as directed. cc: Plaintiff, pro se, with copy of Pro Se Handbook; Defendants as directed (MNM)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/19/2019. Denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. cc: plaintiff pro se(KJA)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/26/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se(MNM)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF TENDERING SUMMONS by Brian A. Truskey (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KJA)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Brian A. Truskey (MNM)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brian A. Truskey (MNM)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION against Vicki Christiansen and Sonny Purdue, filed by Brian A. Truskey. (Attachments: #1 Complaint on Standard Civil Case Form, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Attachments, #4 Envelope) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truskey v. Purdue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Purdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Truskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?