Hadden v. Hines Furlong Line, Inc.

Plaintiff: Charles Hadden
Defendant: Hines Furlong Line, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00076
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/2/2019. Granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob D. Curtis. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel(KJA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Jacob D. Curtis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2896403. by Defendant Hines Furlong Line, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 -Affidavit of Jacob D. Curtis in Support of His Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Proposed Order) (Nienhuis, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Hines Furlong Line, Inc.. (Nienhuis, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hines Furlong Line, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Attested copy of complaint emailed to counsel. (MNM)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hines Furlong Line, Inc., filed by Charles Hadden. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadden v. Hines Furlong Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hadden
Represented By: L. Jeff Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hines Furlong Line, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Nienhuis
Represented By: Jacob D. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?