Teague v. Walmart Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Veronica Teague
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Case Number: 5:2019cv00080
Filed: June 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Thomas B Russell
2 Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lanny King: Scheduling Conference held on 7/22/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2019. Daubert Motion due by 6/23/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2020. Expert Discovery due by 5/14/2020. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 3/26/2020. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 2/20/2020. Fact Discovery due by 1/23/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/5/2019. Telephone Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the Toll Free Meeting Number 1-877-848-7030 and entering the Access Code 7238577#. cc:counsel (KJA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Veronica Teague. (Tveite, Charles)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Sharpe, Felix)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 7/2/2019. See order for specifics.cc:counsel (KJA)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc.. (Sharpe, Felix)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 6/17/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 7/1/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/15/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 11:00 AM Central time before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Please review Order in its entirety for specifics. cc: Counsel of Record, CM-King (MNM)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 06/17/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; Judge King's Chambers (TJD)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL Case reassigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell no longer assigned to case. cc:counsel, CM-Stivers (KJA)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Marshall Circuit Court (MNM)
June 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, and Walmart Inc. (MNM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
June 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, and Corporate Parent WSE Investment, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (MNM)
June 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership from Marshall Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00123 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2876359). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Affidavit, #4 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Teague
Represented By: Charles A. Tveite
Represented By: Mark Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?