Wurth v. Smitty's Supply, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Wurth
Defendant: Smitty's Supply, Inc. and Rural King
Case Number: 5:2019cv00092
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smitty's Supply, Inc.. (Polczynski, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Smitty's Supply, Inc.. (Polczynski, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Nikki E. Cannezzaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2929794. by Defendant Smitty's Supply, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Cannezzaro Pro Hac) (Polczynski, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan T. Polczynski on behalf of Smitty's Supply, Inc. (Polczynski, Ryan)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/31/2019. Granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice William L. Carr. cc: Counsel(KJA)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/29/2019 granting #15 Motion for Attorney Bryan T. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/29/2019 granting #14 Motion for Attorney Gene P. Graham, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 Response to #16 Notice of Deficiency,, RESPONSE to re #16 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Dwayne Wurth. (Bryant, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency re #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: #4 on motion form not answered. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/26/2019. (KJA)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Bryan T. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2901635. by Plaintiff Dwayne Wurth (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bryant, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Gene P Graham, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2901631. by Plaintiff Dwayne Wurth (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bryant, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for William L. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2901622. by Plaintiff Dwayne Wurth (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bryant, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/2/2019. Granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dirk L. Hubbard ; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas V. Bender. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(KJA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Thomas V. Bender to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2896423. by Plaintiff Dwayne Wurth (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standings) (Bryant, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Dirk L. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2896408. by Plaintiff Dwayne Wurth (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standings) (Bryant, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency to Thomas B. Bender re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: No admission or motion to appear pro hac filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/19/2019. (KJA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency Bryan T. White re #1 Complaint;Reason for Deficiency: No Admission or Pro Hac Vice motion filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/15/2019. (MLG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency as to William Carr re #1 Complaint;Reason for Deficiency: No Admission or Pro Hac Vice motion filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/15/2019. (MLG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Gene P. Graham re #1 Complaint;Reason for Deficiency: No Admission or Pro Hac Vice motion filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/15/2019. (MLG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Dirk Hubbard re #1 Complaint;Reason for Deficiency: No Admission or Pro Hac Vice motion filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/15/2019. (MLG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Rural King on 6/27/2019 by Dwayne Wurth. Waiver of Service due by 8/27/2019. (MNM) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit filer (MNM).
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Smitty's Supply, Inc. on 6/27/2019 by Dwayne Wurth. Waiver of Service due by 8/27/2019. (MNM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rural King and Smitty's Supply, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2894152, filed by Dwayne Wurth. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wurth v. Smitty's Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smitty's Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rural King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Wurth
Represented By: Thomas V. Bender
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Dirk Hubbard
Represented By: William Carr
Represented By: Nicholas A. Kennady
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan T. White
Represented By: William L. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?