Vient v. Paxton Media Group
Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Defendant: Paxton Media Group
Case Number: 5:2019cv00141
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE re #11 Response to Motion, by Benjamin Vient. (KJA)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 11/25/2019. Granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Electronically filed by plaintiff. cc: Counsel, plaintiff pro se, QC(KJA)
November 22, 2019 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Paxton Media Group. SEE DN #13 TO VIEW FULL PDF. (MNM)
November 22, 2019 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paxton Media Group. SEE DN #13 TO VIEW FULL PDF. (MNM)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Paxton Media Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Eric Rudolph, #3 Exhibit 3 - Citing Case, #4 Proposed Order) (Rogers, Jeremy) Modified on 11/25/2019 to edit docket text (MNM).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGMENT by Judge Justin R. Walker on 11/19/2019. Judge Justin R. Walker RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for all further proceedings. Counsel shall change the civil action number to reflect the initials GNS for all future filings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
November 8, 2019 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Benjamin Vient. (*NO PDF ATTACHED. This entry has been made for reporting purposes. Plaintiff states within his Motion #11 to Amend Complaint that it is also his response to Defendant's motion #7 to Dismiss. Please see DN #11 for viewing.) (JM)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient. (Attachments: #1 Tendered Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits to Complaint) (JM)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to GO 2019-10. Case reassigned to Judge Justin R. Walker for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel (CDF)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Paxton Media Group (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1- Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2- Brief-Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 3- Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State Claim, #5 Exhibit 4- Motion, #6 Exhibit 5- Entry Order on Motion, #7 Exhibit 6- Complaint with Exhibits, #8 Proposed Order to Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment) (Rogers, Jeremy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Plaintiff Benjamin Vient (KJA)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Vient. Paxton Media Group served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (KJA)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell no longer assigned to case. cc:counsel, CM-Stivers (KJA)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT re #1 Complaint. cc: Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 (MNM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 REGISTRATION TO RECEIVE DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY filed by Benjamin Vient. (MNM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Paxton Media Group. Plaintiff is responsible for serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paxton Media Group. Filing fee $400, receipt number P33004029, filed by Benjamin Vient. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vient v. Paxton Media Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paxton Media Group
Represented By: Jeremy S. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?