Wiley v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Kevin Wiley
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00149
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. (Fox, Ronald)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. (Fox, Ronald)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/30/2019. Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ronald E. Fox. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(KJA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore H. Lucas on behalf of Marquette Transportation Company, LLC (Lucas, Theodore)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Ronald E. Fox to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2973015. by Defendant Marquette Transportation Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Fox, Ronald)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Noah M. Wexler re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/4/2019. (KJA)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Christopher J. Balser re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/4/2019. (KJA)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency for Ben Bireley re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/4/2019. (KJA)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marquette Transportation Company, LLC, filed by Kevin Wiley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wiley
Represented By: Ben Bireley
Represented By: Mark Edwards
Represented By: Noah M. Wexler
Represented By: Christopher J. Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Represented By: Theodore H. Lucas
Represented By: Ronald E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?