United States of America v. Fennel et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cheryl Fennel and Asset Acceptance LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00184
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Asset Acceptance LLC served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. (Campbell, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Cheryl Fennel served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cheryl Fennel. (Prince, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Asset Acceptance LLC and Cheryl Fennel. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Asset Acceptance LLC and Cheryl Fennel, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Judgment Lien, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Fennel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Fennel
Represented By: Robert L. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?