United States of America v. Thurston et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Terri M. Thurston, Midland Funding, LLC, Unknown Heirs and Spouses, Unknown Spouse, Billy Reed Thurston, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Terri M. Ellegood, CACH, LLC, Deborah K. Thurston, Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, Asset Acceptance, LLC and Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Not Classified By Court: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 5:2019cv00190
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/27/2020. Granting #17 Warning Order. Attorney Julie A. Tennyson for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Any Unknown Spouse of Terri M. Thurston f/k/a Terri M. Ellegood and Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of James T. Thurston by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Midland Funding, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Stinnett, W.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Midland Funding, LLC. (Stinnett, W.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Asset Acceptance, LLC. (Stinnett, W.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. CACH, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Asset Acceptance, LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Deborah K. Thurston served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Billy Reed Thurston served on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Terri M. Thurston served on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Campbell, William)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Asset Acceptance, LLC, CACH, LLC, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, Midland Funding, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Billy Reed Thurston, Deborah K. Thurston, Terri M. Thurston. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (KJA)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (KJA)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-Reamortization Agreement, #5 Exhibit E-Judgment Lien, #6 Exhibit F-Judgment Lien, #7 Exhibit G-Judgment Lien, #8 Exhibit H-Judgment Lien, #9 Exhibit I-Judgment Lien, #10 Exhibit J-Judgment Lien, #11 Exhibit K-Judgment Lien, #12 Exhibit L-Judgment Lien, #13 Cover Sheet) (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Thurston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri M. Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: W. Scott Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs and Spouses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Reed Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri M. Ellegood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah K. Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance, LLC
Represented By: W. Scott Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: W. Scott Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Julie A. Tennyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?