United States of America v. Humphreys et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Discover Bank, Midland Funding LLC and Linda R. Humphreys
Case Number: 5:2020cv00010
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Discover Bank served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Campbell, William)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Linda R. Humphreys served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Campbell, William)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Midland Funding LLC served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Campbell, William)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Discover Bank, Linda R. Humphreys, and Midland Funding LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Discover Bank, Linda R. Humphreys, and Midland Funding LLC, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Second Note, #3 Exhibit C - First Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Corrected First Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Third Note, #7 Exhibit G - Second Mortgage, #8 Exhibit H - Fourth Note, #9 Exhibit I - Judgment Lien, #10 Exhibit J - Judgment Lien, #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Humphreys et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda R. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?